EP0948818 - HIGH DENSITY TRENCH DMOS TRANSISTOR WITH TRENCH BOTTOM IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILICONIX Incorporated 2201 Laurelwood Road Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2009/02] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states SILICONIX Incorporated 2201 Laurelwood Road Santa Clara California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSHIEH, Fwu-Iuan 20768 Sevilla Lane Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
FLOYD, Brian, H. 657 E. McKinley Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Mike 13095 Montebello Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
NIM, Danny 1561 Orangewood Drive San Jose, CA 95121 / US | 05 /
NG, Daniel 3887 Via Montalvo Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2009/02] |
Former [1999/47] | 01 /
HSHIEH, Fwu-Iuan 20768 Sevilla Lane Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | ||
02 /
FLOYD, Brian, H. 657 E. McKinley Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
03 /
CHANG, Mike 13095 Montebello Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
NIM, Danny 1561 Orangewood Drive San Jose, CA 95121 / US | |||
05 /
NG, Daniel 3887 Via Montalvo 1238 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | |||
Former [1999/41] | 01 /
HSHIEH, Fwu-Iuan 20768 Sevilla Lane Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | ||
02 /
FLOYD, Brian, H. 657 E. McKinley Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
03 /
CHANG, Mike 13095 Montebello Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
NIM, Danny 1561 Orangewood Drive San Jose, CA 95121 / US | |||
05 /
NG, Daniel 1035 Aster Avenue 1238 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/35] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Kolb, Georg, et al Daimler-Benz AG, Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 97934104.7 | 18.07.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997US12046 | Priority number, date | US19960684363 | 19.07.1996 Original published format: US 684363 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804004 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948818 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0948818 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L29/08 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L29/0878 (EP,US);
H01L29/1095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/03] | H01L29/76, H01L29/78, H01L29/10, H01L21/336 | ||
Former IPC [1999/41] | H01L29/76 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1999/41] | Title | German: | HOCHDICHTE-GRABEN-DMOS-TRANSISTOR MIT GRABENBODEMIMPLANTIERUNG | [1999/41] | English: | HIGH DENSITY TRENCH DMOS TRANSISTOR WITH TRENCH BOTTOM IMPLANT | [1999/41] | French: | TRANSISTOR DMOS POUR TRANCHEES A HAUTE DENSITE A IMPLANT DE FOND DE TRANCHEE | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 22.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08022385.2 / EP2043158 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2006 | 31.07.2007 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 07.01.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | [2010/28] |
Former [2009/30] | NL | 07.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0621468 ; | [Y]US5168331 (YILMAZ HAMZA [US]) [Y] 8,11 * column A; figures 1,7 *; | [PX]JPH08306914 ; | US5714781 [ ] (YAMAMOTO TSUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0720235 (SILICONIX INC [US]) [X] 1 * column A; figure 12A *; | [A]US5341011 (HSHIEH FWU-IUAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940422), vol. 018, no. 225, Database accession no. (E - 1541), & JP06021468 A 19940128 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * [Y] 8,11 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08306914 A 19961122 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [PX] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5442214 (YANG SHENG-HSING [TW]); | [YP]US5558313 (HSHIEH FWU-IUAN [US], et al); | [Y]US4893160 (BLANCHARD RICHARD A [US]); | [Y]US4964080 (TZENG JYH-CHERNG J [US]); | [Y]JPH05343691 (NIPPON DENSO CO) |