EP0913008 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM FOR ELECTRIC GENERATION, HEATING, COOLING AND VENTILATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Revocation of patent | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTEK CORPORATION 460 Totten Pond Road Waltham, MA 02154 / US | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Michael, S. 56 Round Hill Road Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | 02 /
ONG, Robin, Y. 48 Forest Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massett Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Downing, Michael Philip Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Gables, Massett Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/18] | Downing, Michael Philip Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97934233.4 | 16.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997US12707 | Priority number, date | US19960022532P | 19.07.1996 Original published format: US 22532 P | US19970866981 | 02.06.1997 Original published format: US 866981 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9804011 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913008 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913008 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/00, H01M8/04 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
H01M8/04074 (EP,US);
F24F5/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B15/04 (EP,KR,US);
F25B27/02 (EP,US);
F28D21/0001 (EP,US);
F28F13/00 (EP,US);
F28F13/003 (EP,US);
H01M8/00 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
F24F2203/026 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0043 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M2008/147 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0008 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0014 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0051 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0074 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
Y02A30/274 (EP,US);
Y02B30/625 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM ZUR STROMERZEUGUNG, HEIZUNG UND KÜHLUNG UND VENTILATION | [1999/18] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM FOR ELECTRIC GENERATION, HEATING, COOLING AND VENTILATION | [1999/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION D'ELECTRICITE POUR CHAUFFAGE, CLIMATISATION ET VENTILATION | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 22.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2004
Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE Opponents representative Cohausz, Helge B., et al, et al Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2004
Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE Opponents representative Cohausz, Helge B., Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Cohausz Dawidowicz Hannig & Partner Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 15.07.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.04.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/24] | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2003 | CH | 10.09.2003 | FR | 10.09.2003 | LI | 10.09.2003 | NL | 10.09.2003 | DK | 10.12.2003 | GR | 10.12.2003 | SE | 10.12.2003 | GB | 16.07.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/46] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
GB | 16.07.2004 | ||
FR | 24.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
FR | 24.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 10.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08148166 ; | [X]JPH05299107 ; | [X]JPH07243776 ; | [X]JPH0660899 ; | [X]JPH07169483 ; | [X]JPH0636786 ; | [A]JPH07135010 ; | [DX]US4853100 (HSU MICHAEL S [US]) [DX] 47-55,57,59-63,76-88,90-92,102 * figures 4,6; claims 1,8-12 * * column 7, line 45 - line 66 * * column 3, line 28 - line 46 *; | [X]DE4234151 (KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,11,14,15,24,26,29,31,35,36,38,46 * column 3, line 32 - line 50; figure 1 * * column 4, line 26 - line 58 *; | [X]EP0568822 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,11,14,15,47,50-53,57,59,60,80,81,85,86,88,102 * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 15; figure 1; claims 1,2,7,8 * * column 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 6, line 33 - line 38 *; | [XY]WO9413026 (HSU MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 47-55,57-63,65-68,76-78,80-92,94,95,102 * page 4, line 17 - line 29; figures 1,4,5,7-9; claims 1,2 * * page 7, line 11 - line 36 * * page 10, line 7 - page 12, line 14 * * page 14, line 7 - line 18 * [Y] 63-66,69-71,75,76,78,92-94,96-98,101; | [Y]US5338622 (HSU MICHAEL S [US], et al) [Y] 63-66,69-71,75,76,78,92-94,96-98,101 * figures 1-3,5-7; claims 1,2,9,11 * * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 18 * * column 5, line 6 - line 36 * * column 6, line 19 - line 32 *; | [X]WO9506842 (AQUA CHEM INC [US]) [X] 47,50,52,53,59,80,81,85,86,102 * page 4, line 15 - line 29; figure 2 * * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 4; claims 1,2 *; | [XY]WO9526430 (ZTEK CORP [US]) [X] 47-55,57-63,78-92,102 * page 11, line 21 - line 33; figures 5,6 * * page 12, line 18 - line 35 * * claims 1,3,17,18,22-25,27 * [Y] 63-66,69-71,75,76,78,92-94,96-98,101; | [D]US5462817 (HSU MICHAEL S [US]); | [X] - KAZUO OSHIMA ET AL, "HEAT RECOVERY FROM FUEL CELL EXHAUST GAS FOR COOLING TELECOMMUNICATIONS EQUIPMENT", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19921101), vol. E75 - B, no. 11, pages 1119 - 1125, XP000336067 [X] 1-7,24,25,29,35,46 * abstract * * page 1122, column R, paragraph 3 - page 1124, column L, paragraph L; figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 096, no. 010, & JP08148166 A 19960607 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-8,11,14-16,24,25,29,31,35,36,38,39,46 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 96-326501 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940215), vol. 018, no. 091, Database accession no. (E - 1508), & JP05299107 A 19931112 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP ;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-5,7,24,25,29,35,46 * abstract * | [X] - W. L. LUNDBERG, "COGENERATION APPLICATION OF A NATURAL, GAS-FUELED SOFC GENERATOR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON FUEL CELLS NOVEMBER 6-7 1989 SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA THE ELECTROCHEMICLA SOCIETY PENNINGTON, vol. 89, no. 14, pages 118 - 29, XP002047354 [X] 1-8,24,25,29,35,46,47,50-53,59,62,80,81,85-87,102 * abstract * * page 121, paragraph 4 - page 122, paragraph 2 * * page 123, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 4,5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 096, no. 001, & JP07243776 A 19950919 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [X] 1-5,7,14,15,25,29,35,36,38,46 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 95-356034 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940602), vol. 018, no. 290, Database accession no. (E - 1557), & JP06060899 A 19940304 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [X] 1-5,7,14,15,25,29,35,36,38,45,46 * abstract * | [X] - KUNIO SHIBATA, "THE TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY (TEPCO) FUEL CELL EVALUATION PROGRAM", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (19920101), vol. 37, no. 1 / 02, pages 81 - 99, XP000258149 [X] 1-7,14,15,24,25,29,35,36,46,80 * page 86, paragraph 1 - paragraph 6; figure 2 * * page 89, paragraph 1; figure 3B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-7753(92)80066-K | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, & JP07169483 A 19950704 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-5,7,24,25,29,35,46 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 95-267030 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940513), vol. 018, no. 252, Database accession no. (E - 1547), & JP06036786 A 19940210 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP ;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-5,7,25,29,35 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 095, no. 008, & JP07135010 A 19950523 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO INC:THE;OTHERS: 01) [A] 17 * abstract * |