EP0917459 - TABLET DOSAGE FORM OF CLAVULANIC ACID AND AMOXYCILLIN COMPRISING A TREHALOSE EXCIPIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elan Drug Delivery Limited 1 Mere Way, Ruddington Nottingham, NG11 6JS / GB | [2002/47] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Quadrant Healthcare (UK) Limited 1 Mere Way Ruddington, Nottingham NG11 6JS / GB | ||
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states QUADRANT HEALTHCARE (UK) LIMITED Maris Lane Trumpington, Cambridge CB2 2SY / GB | ||
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states QUADRANT HOLDINGS CAMBRIDGE LIMITED Maris Lane Trumpington, Cambridge CB2 2SY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIBBON, Enda, Martin 18 South Mill Road, Bishops Stortford Herts CM23 3DP / GB | 02 /
MARTYN, Glen, Patrick 27 Ermine Street Caxton, Cambridgeshire CB3 8PQ / GB | 03 /
COLACO, Camilo, Anthony, Leo, Selwyn 107 Foster Road Cambridge CB2 2JN / GB | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1999/21] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 97934631.9 | 04.08.1997 | [1999/21] | WO1997GB02083 | Priority number, date | GB19960016536 | 06.08.1996 Original published format: GB 9616536 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805305 | Date: | 12.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0917459 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
A61K9/2018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/21] | Title | German: | CLAVULANSÄURE UND AMOXYCILLIN ENTHALTENDE TABLETTENDOSIERUNGSFORM MIT TREHALOSE ALS HILFSSTOFF | [1999/21] | English: | TABLET DOSAGE FORM OF CLAVULANIC ACID AND AMOXYCILLIN COMPRISING A TREHALOSE EXCIPIENT | [1999/21] | French: | FORME POSOLOGIQUE EN COMPRIME D'ACIDE CLAVULANIQUE ET D'AMOXICILLINE COMPORTANT UN EXCIPIENT A BASE DE TREHALOSE | [1999/21] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/29] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2005538 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) [Y] 1,10,11,13,20,21 * page 1; examples 1,4; claims 1,2,5,6,9,11 *; | [A]WO8700196 (QUADRANT BIORESOURCES LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraphs 2-3; claims 1,8-10 *; | [Y]US4678812 (BOLLIN JR ERNEST [US], et al) [Y] 1,6,10,11,13,17,20,21 * column 2, lines 42-54; claim 1 * * column 3, lines 31-34 * * column 4, lines 6-8 * * column 4, lines 33-45 *; | [A]GB2206273 (QUADRANT BIORESOURCES LTD) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 4; claims 1,2,4 * * page 4, paragraphs 2-3 *; | [Y]EP0415567 (QUADRANT BIORESOURCES LTD [GB]) [Y] 1 * page 2, lines 8-13 * * page 2, lines 21-22 * * page 2, lines 49-55; claims 4,7-10,13,14 *; | [DA]WO9219227 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1,10-13,17-19 * page 2, paragraphs 2-3; examples 9-14 * * page 3, paragraph 4; claims 1-6 * * page 4, paragraphs 3-4; claims 8-17 *; | [A]WO9222298 (UNGER EVAN C [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 12, lines 21-23 * * page 20, lines 26-36 *; | [Y]EP0664117 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1,6,10,11,13,17,20,21 * page 2, line 16; claims 1,2 * * page 3, lines 50-56; claims 3,8,10 *; | [DY]WO9528927 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [DY] 1,6,10,11,13,17,20 * page 2, lines 20-33; example 1; claims 1,2,4,5 * * page 3, lines 9-13 * * page 1, lines 16-22 * * page 1, lines 29-32 *; | [Y]EP0693558 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [Y] 1,6,10,11,13,17,20,21 * page 8, lines 8-13 * * page 8, line 52 - page 9, line 1 *; | [A]WO9622107 (QUADRANT HOLDINGS CAMBRIDGE [GB], et al) [A] 1* page 1, paragraph 4 * |