EP0912872 - ELECTRONIC FIREARM AND PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRONIC FIREARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RA BRANDS, L.L.C. 870 Remington Drive Madison, NC 27025 / US | [2001/12] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Remington Arms Company, Inc. 870 Remington Drive, P.O. Box 700 Madison, NC 27025-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANNER, Dale, R. P.O. Box 2324 Elizabethtown, KY 42702 / US | 02 /
NORTON, Vincent, B. 116 Sharon Court Elizabethtown, KY 42701 / US | 03 /
RONKAINEN, James, W. 571 Old Sonora Road Hodgenville, KY 42748 / US | 04 /
WOLTERMAN, David, S. 891 Overall Phillips Road Elizabethtown, KY 42701 / US | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/40] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1999/18] | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97936055.9 | 14.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997US12089 | Priority number, date | US19960680490 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: US 680490 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802705 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912872 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912872 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F41A19/58, F41A19/70, F41A9/53 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
F41A19/70 (EP,US);
F41A3/22 (EP,US);
F41A9/53 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/18] | F41A19/58, F41A19/70 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/18] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE FEUERWAFFE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINER SOLCHEN WAFFE | [1999/18] | English: | ELECTRONIC FIREARM AND PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRONIC FIREARM | [1999/18] | French: | ARME A FEU ELECTRONIQUE ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE LADITE ARME | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 12.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 28.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3250034 (SIMMONS ERNEST P); | [A]US3255547 (GREGORY JR LEVERETTE B); | [A]US3580113 (RAMSAY MARCUS, et al); | [A]US3650174 (NELSEN THOMAS SLOAN); | [A]US3814017 (BACKSTEIN G, et al); | [A]US4332098 (ESTENEVY SERGE); | [A]US4347679 (GRUENIG KURT, et al); | [A]US4563828 (KRIEGESKORTE ARNDT [DE]); | [A]US4793085 (SURAWSKI STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [A]US5303495 (HARTHCOCK JERRY D [US]); | [A]US5329840 (CORNEY MARTIN [US]) |