EP0919067 - CHARGED PARTICLE VELOCITY ANALYSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Millbrook Instruments Limited Blackburn Technology Centre, Challenge Way, Greenbank Technology Park Blackburn Lancashire BB1 5QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Millbrook Instruments Limited Blackburn Technology Centre, Challenge Way, Greenbank Technology Park Blackburn, Lancashire BB1 5QB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEELE, Timothy, Andrew, 227 Avenue Road Extension Clarendon Park, Leicester Leicestershire LE2 3ER / GB | 02 /
UNWIN, Ronald, Charles 10 Constable Drive, Wilmslow Cheshire SK9 2NS / GB | 03 /
ECCLES, Adrian, John Northwood House, White Coppice Anglezarke PR6 9DF / GB | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97936783.6 | 18.08.1997 | [1999/22] | WO1997GB02182 | Priority number, date | GB19960017312 | 17.08.1996 Original published format: GB 9617312 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9808244 | Date: | 26.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919067 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0919067 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/40, H01J49/44, H01J49/00 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
H01J49/0031 (EP);
H01J49/022 (EP);
H01J49/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/22] | H01J49/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/22] | Title | German: | GESCHWINDIGKEITSANALYSATOR GELADENER TEILCHEN | [1999/22] | English: | CHARGED PARTICLE VELOCITY ANALYSER | [1999/22] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE VITESSE DE PARTICULES CHARGEES | [1999/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 17.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9103071 (INST ENERGET KHIM FIZ) [X] 1-28 * abstract *; | [X]US4707602 (KNORR FRITZ J) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2681471 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT ;OPEA LABO OPTIQUE ELECTRO APPL (FR)) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9104571 (INST KOSM I AKADEMII NAUK S) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [A]US5160840 (VESTAL MARVIN L) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4137114 (SPECTRO MASS SPECTROMETRY GES) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS59173939 ; | [A]JPS58172854 ; | [A]JPS61195554 ; | [A]JPS6182651 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850209), vol. 009, no. 031, Database accession no. (E - 295), & JP59173939 A 19841002 (NAGOYA DAIGAKU GAKUCHIYOU) [A] 1-28 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840113), vol. 008, no. 008, Database accession no. (E - 221), & JP58172854 A 19831011 (NAGOYA DAIGAKU GAKUCHIYOU) [A] 1-28 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870127), vol. 011, no. 027, Database accession no. (E - 474), & JP61195554 A 19860829 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-28 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860902), vol. 010, no. 255, Database accession no. (E - 433), & JP61082651 A 19860426 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-28 * abstract * |