EP0955874 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STABLE IMPEDANCE PLETHYSMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.S. Medical Monitoring Ltd. P.O. Box 45010, Har Hotzvim 91450 Jerusalem / IL | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RABINOVITCH, Pavel Haim Toren 29/2 97823 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
SHOCHAT, Michael Havatzelet 26 45858 Matan / IL | 03 /
ZELDIN, Vladimir Hakeren 32/7 98351 Maale Adumim / IL | 04 /
MILMAN, Oscar Nahal Grofan 7 90610 Maale Adumim / IL | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 97937032.7 | 28.07.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US13122 | Priority number, date | US19960693660 | 09.08.1996 Original published format: US 693660 | US19970820464 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: US 820464 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9806328 | Date: | 19.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955874 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
A61B5/0535 (EP,US);
A61B5/276 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | A61B5/04, A61B5/05 | ||
Former IPC [1999/46] | A61B5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPEDANZ-PLETHYSMOGRAPHIE | [1999/46] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STABLE IMPEDANCE PLETHYSMOGRAPHY | [1999/46] | French: | METHODE ET DISPOSITIF POUR UNE PLETHYSMOGRAPHIE PAR IMPEDANCE STABLE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 08.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0008846 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-9,12,21-23,25-27,33,34 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 13 * * page 15, line 14 - page 18, line 3 * * page 21, line 4 - page 23, line 27 * * page 61, line 5 - page 62, line 9 * [A] 13,20,24,28,29,35,36,42,43 | International search | [A]US4561448 (BUCHAS GERALD L [US]); | [A]US4919145 (MARRIOTT ARTHUR R [US]); | [A]US5501230 (LARIBIERE LAURENT [FR]) | by applicant | US3340867 | USRE30101E | US3874368 | US3971365 |