EP0857243 - GRID CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USG INTERIORS, Inc. 125 South Franklin Street Chicago Illinois 60606-4678 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states USG INTERIORS, Inc. 125 South Franklin Street Chicago, Illinois 60606-4678 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LaLONDE, Paul, D. 4854 Center Road Avon, OH 44011 / US | 02 /
KOSKI, Gerald, L. 7609 Sleepy Hollow Drive Parma, OH 44130 / US | 03 /
LEHANE, James, J. 15996 Church Hill Drive Columbia Station, OH 44028 / US | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 97937079.8 | 31.07.1997 | [1998/33] | WO1997US13505 | Priority number, date | US19960690845 | 01.08.1996 Original published format: US 690845 | [1998/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805831 | Date: | 12.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857243 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857243 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/00, E04B9/12 | [2001/15] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1998/33] | E04B2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/33] | Title | German: | GITTERROSTERVERBINDER | [1998/33] | English: | GRID CONNECTOR | [1998/33] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR OSSATURE DE PLAFOND | [1998/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 02.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3501185 (BROWN DONALD A, et al) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 47 - column 3, line 64 ** figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4525973 (VUKMANIC RONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]US4648230 (MIEYAL DAVID F [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 5, line 54 - column 5, line 63 * * figures 1,3,5 * | International search | [X]US5271202 (VUKMANIC RONALD W [US], et al) | by applicant | US5517796 |