EP0863597 - POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states ROHM Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Hiroyuki Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Koichi Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615 / JP | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97937859.3 | 28.08.1997 | [1998/37] | WO1997JP03048 | Priority number, date | JP19960228075 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22807596 | JP19960228076 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22807696 | [1998/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9809361 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863597 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/18, H02J7/00, G05F1/56 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
G05F3/222 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00306 (KR);
G05F3/265 (EP,KR,US);
H02H7/18 (EP,US);
H02J7/00304 (KR);
H02J7/0031 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/37] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE STROMVERSORGUNG | [1998/37] | English: | POWER SUPPLY | [1998/37] | French: | SOURCE D'ALIMENTATION ELECTRIQUE | [1998/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1998 | Translation filed | 24.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 24.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 11.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0588615 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 22, line 34 - page 23, line 21; figure 9 * * page 25, line 48 - line 50 *; | [A]US5343137 (KITAOKA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3* abstract * | International search | [A]JPS5669438U ; | [A]JPH02188131 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JPH08214462 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO) |