EP0938588 - SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TM Technologies Inc. 82 Cummings Park Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANE, Michael, J. 3044 Claybourne Lane Baldwinsville, NY 13027 / US | 02 /
BENIGHT, Albert, S. 1630 Valley View Drive Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | 03 /
FALDASZ, Brian, D. 4 Bellevue Terrace Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97937967.4 | 11.07.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US12118 | Priority number, date | US19960022718P | 12.07.1996 Original published format: US 22718 P | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9802580 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0938588 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938588 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6844 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6804 (EP,US);
C12Q1/682 (EP,US);
G01N2458/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2525/313, C12Q2563/179 (US,EP);
C12Q1/682, C12Q2525/313, C12Q2563/179 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2525/173 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALVERSTÄRKUNG | [1999/35] | English: | SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION METHOD | [1999/35] | French: | PROCEDE D'AMPLIFICATION DE SIGNAUX | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.02.2003 | BE | 12.02.2003 | CH | 12.02.2003 | FI | 12.02.2003 | GR | 12.02.2003 | IT | 12.02.2003 | LI | 12.02.2003 | NL | 12.02.2003 | DK | 12.05.2003 | PT | 12.05.2003 | SE | 12.05.2003 | IE | 11.07.2003 | LU | 11.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | ES | 28.08.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
BE | 12.02.2003 | ||
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
IE | 11.07.2003 | ||
LU | 11.07.2003 | ||
MC | 31.07.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
BE | 12.02.2003 | ||
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
IE | 11.07.2003 | ||
LU | 11.07.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
BE | 12.02.2003 | ||
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
LU | 11.07.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
BE | 12.02.2003 | ||
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 12.02.2003 | |
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 12.02.2003 | |
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 12.02.2003 | |
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 12.02.2003 | |
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 12.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8403520 (BLAIR MALCOLM A D, et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10-12,16,17,22-24,26 * see whole document, esp. claims and page 15 line 1 ff. *; | [X]EP0128332 (ENZO BIOCHEM INC [US]) [X] 1-12,16,17,22-24,26 * see whole document esp. claims and figures *; | [X]EP0204510 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [X]WO8703622 (UNIV PRINCETON [US]) [X] 1-3,12,22 * see esp. claims and figures 1 *; | [X]WO9600795 (KALYX BIOSCIENCES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,12,14 * see claims and abstract, page 19,line 14 ff. *; | [PX]US5635352 (URDEA MICHAEL S [US], et al) [PX] 1-3* the whole document * |