EP0938538 - METHOD FOR CUTTING OR ABRASIVE WORKING OF METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/35] | COMPOSITION FOR CUTTING OR ABRASIVE WORKING OF METAL | ||
[2003/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILBRATH, Dean, S. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
GRENFELL, Mark, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
KRUEGER, Daniel, D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
FLYNN, Richard, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
BEHR, Frederick, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [1999/35] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 97938184.5 | 12.08.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US13979 | Priority number, date | US19960715207 | 17.09.1996 Original published format: US 715207 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812287 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938538 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938538 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C10M105/54, // C10N40/22 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
C10M169/041 (EP,US);
C10M105/54 (EP,KR,US);
C10M127/02 (EP,US);
C10M127/04 (EP,US);
C10M129/70 (EP,US);
C10M129/76 (EP,US);
C10M131/04 (EP,US);
C10M131/10 (EP,US);
C10M133/06 (EP,US);
C10M133/10 (EP,US);
C10M133/44 (EP,US);
C10M133/50 (EP,US);
C10M135/24 (EP,US);
C10M135/26 (EP,US);
C10M137/02 (EP,US);
C10M137/04 (EP,US);
C10M145/28 (EP,US);
C10M145/38 (EP,US);
C10M147/02 (EP,US);
C10M147/04 (EP,US);
C10M169/04 (EP,US);
C10M2203/02 (EP,US);
C10M2203/022 (EP,US);
C10M2203/024 (EP,US);
C10M2203/04 (EP,US);
C10M2203/06 (EP,US);
C10M2207/021 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/284 (EP,US);
C10M2207/286 (EP,US);
C10M2207/287 (EP,US);
C10M2207/288 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2209/103 (EP,US);
C10M2209/104 (EP,US);
C10M2209/109 (EP,US);
C10M2211/022 (EP,US);
C10M2211/0406 (EP,US);
C10M2211/042 (EP,US);
C10M2211/0425 (EP,US);
C10M2211/0445 (EP,US);
C10M2211/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/00 (EP,US);
C10M2213/02 (EP,US);
C10M2213/04 (EP,US);
C10M2213/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/062 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/044 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2219/084 (EP,US);
C10M2219/085 (EP,US);
C10M2223/02 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US);
C10M2223/10 (EP,US);
C10N2040/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN ODER ZUR SCHLEIFBEARBEITUNG VON METALL | [2003/27] | English: | METHOD FOR CUTTING OR ABRASIVE WORKING OF METAL | [2003/27] | French: | METHODE DE DECOUPAGE OU A L'USINAGE PAR ABRASION DE METAUX | [2003/27] |
Former [1999/35] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN ODER ZUR SCHLEIFBEARBEITUNG VON METALL | ||
Former [1999/35] | COMPOSITION FOR CUTTING OR ABRASIVE WORKING OF METAL | ||
Former [1999/35] | COMPOSITION SERVANT AU DECOUPAGE OU A L'USINAGE PAR ABRASION DE METAUX | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 25.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 12.08.2004 | BE | 31.08.2004 | CH | 31.08.2004 | LI | 31.08.2004 | [2005/51] |
Former [2005/46] | GB | 12.08.2004 | |
CH | 31.08.2004 | ||
LI | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 31.08.2004 | |
LI | 31.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XDA]WO9622356 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [XD] 1,3,4,6,8 * page 33, line 10 - page 39, line 10; examples 1-38; claims 2-10 * * page 41, lines 1-21; tables 1,2 * [A] 2; | [XA]US5547593 (SANECHIKA KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8 * column 46, line 66 - column 50, line 47; examples 1-20,37-42 * * examples 74-78,82 * [A] 2; | [X]WO9324586 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8 * page 3, line 25 - page 7, line 21 * * page 95, lines 25-29 *; | [XD]US5476974 (MOORE GEORGE G I [US], et al) [XD] 1,3 * column 14, lines 37-45; table A *; | [XD]EP0565118 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [XD] 1,3,4,6,8 * examples 8-22,25,26; claim 12 * | Examination | WO9735673 |