EP0869883 - ORIENTATIONLESS SQUIB CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR AUTOMOTIVE AIR BAG ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMAS & BETTS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1555 Lynfield Road Memphis, TN 38119 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Thomas & Betts International Inc. 1555 Lynfield Road Memphis, TN 38119 / US | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states THOMAS & BETTS CORPORATION 1555 Lynnfield Road Memphis, Tennessee 38119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUKER, Bradford, K. 20375 Villa Grande Circle Clinton Township, MI 48038 / US | 02 /
RHEIN, David, J. 1009 Kinney Road Memphis, MI 48041 / US | 03 /
LAPRAIK, Scott, J. 24 Woodwind Drive Spartanburg, SC 29349 / US | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97938274.4 | 11.08.1997 | [1998/42] | WO1997US14251 | Priority number, date | US19960024017P | 12.08.1996 Original published format: US 24017 P | US19960029863P | 01.11.1996 Original published format: US 29863 P | US19970035680P | 24.01.1997 Original published format: US 35680 P | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9807213 | Date: | 19.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0869883 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869883 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/28, H01R29/00, F42B3/12, H01R13/703, H01R13/627, H01R13/506 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
H01R13/7032 (EP,US);
H01R13/7033 (EP,US);
H01R13/4361 (EP,US);
H01R13/4362 (EP,US);
H01R13/506 (EP,US);
H01R13/6271 (EP,US);
H01R13/6272 (EP,US);
H01R13/6275 (EP,US);
H01R13/639 (EP,US);
H01R2201/26 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/42] | B60R21/28, H01R29/00, F42B3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/42] | Title | German: | RICHTUNGSFREIE ZÜNDPILLE-ANSCHLUSSEINRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG-LUFTSACKSYSTEME | [1998/42] | English: | ORIENTATIONLESS SQUIB CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR AUTOMOTIVE AIR BAG ASSEMBLIES | [1998/42] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR D'AMORCE EXEMPT D'ORIENTATION POUR ENSEMBLES AIRBAG D'AUTOMOBILES | [1998/42] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 24.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 14.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03076867.5 / EP1378973 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.10.2003 | IT | 08.10.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 08.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4306499 (HOLMES WAYNE W) [A] 14 * abstract *; | [XAY]US5334025 (FOEHL ARTUR [DE]) [X] 1,11,15,16,25 * the whole document * [A] 26 [Y] 8,12,17,22; | [A]EP0624923 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 2,24* figure 2 *; | [A]EP0632534 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [A] 14,58 * column 2, lines 8-19 - column 3, lines 33-44; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5401180 (MUZSLAY STEVEN Z [US]) [Y] 8,12,17,22 * figure 5 * |