EP0920599 - Measuring the effects of the refractive index of a gas using different multiple path interferometry ( superhetrodyne ) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/23] | SUPERHETERODYNE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING THE REFRACTIVE INDEX OF AIR USING MULTIPLE-PASS INTERFEROMETRY | ||
[2003/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZYGO CORPORATION Laurel Brook Road, Post Office Box 448 Middlefield Connecticut 06455-0448 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states ZYGO CORPORATION Laurel Brook Road, Post Office Box 448 Middlefield Connecticut 06455-0448 / US | ||
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states ZYGO CORPORATION Laurel Brook Road, Post Office Box 448 Middlefield Connecticut 06455-0448 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Henry, Allen 340 South Avenida de Palmas Tucson, AZ 85716 / US | 02 /
DE GROOT, Peter 355 Laurel Grove Road Middletown, CT 06457 / US | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Cole, David John, et al 46 Kirkhill Gardens West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Cole, David John, et al 46 Kirkhill Gardens, West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang, Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | ||
Former [2000/09] | Cole, David John Executive Liaison Services, 43 Mount Felix Walton-on-Thames, Surrey KT12 2PJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/23] | Cole, David John Executive Liaison Services, 54 Templemere, Oatlands Drive Weybridge, Surrey KT13 9PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97938284.3 | 14.08.1997 | [1999/23] | WO1997US14273 | Priority number, date | US19960700113 | 20.08.1996 Original published format: US 700113 | DE1997127402 | 27.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19727402 | [1999/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808047 | Date: | 26.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0920599 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0920599 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
G01J9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1999/23] | Title | German: | Messen von Effekten des Brechungsindex eines Gases mit unterschiedlicher Vielfach - Interferometrie ( superheterodyn ) | [2003/11] | English: | Measuring the effects of the refractive index of a gas using different multiple path interferometry ( superhetrodyne ) | [2003/11] | French: | Mesure des effets de l'indice de réfraction d'un gaz par interférometrie à chemins multiples différents ( superhéterodyne ) | [2003/11] |
Former [1999/23] | SUPERHETERODYNVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MESSEN DES BRECHUNGSINDEXES VON LUFT MITTELS MULTI-STRAHL-INTERFEROMETRIE | ||
Former [1999/23] | SUPERHETERODYNE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING THE REFRACTIVE INDEX OF AIR USING MULTIPLE-PASS INTERFEROMETRY | ||
Former [1999/23] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL SUPERHETERODYNES PERMETTANT DE MESURER L'INDICE DE REFRACTION DE L'AIR PAR UNE INTERFEROMETRIE A PLUSIEURS PASSES | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 27.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 13.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5404222 (SPARTA) [DX] 13-18 * column 5, line 32 - line 38; figure 1 * | International search | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, March 1989, Vol. 28(3), ISHIDA A., "Two-Wavelength Displacement-Measuring Interferometer Using Second-Harmonic Light to Eliminate Air Turbulence-Induced Errors", pages 587-589. |