EP1011631 - ANTACID COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUHADIYA, Ashok Premchand B/28 Uday Rekha CHS, Pl.12, Manish Nagar, 4 Bung. Andheri (W), Mumbai 400 058 / IN | 02 /
GOEL, Vikram Apt. 14, 137 Jyoti Sadan, MarineDriv e Mumbai 400 020 / IN | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Lovett House Lovett Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97938349.4 | 15.08.1997 | [2000/26] | WO1997US14425 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908656 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011631 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
A61K9/0056 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | ANTACID ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2000/26] | English: | ANTACID COMPOSITION | [2000/26] | French: | COMPOSITION ANTIACIDE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 01.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4446135 (FOUNTAINE HARVEY A [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 9 - line 21 * * column 2, line 20 - line 57 * * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 45 *; | [X]EP0166440 (SEARLE & CO [US]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-12 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraphs 2-3 * |