EP0944748 - FLAKE-RESISTANT MULTILAYER THIN-FILM ELECTRODES AND ELECTROLYTIC CELLS INCORPORATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miley, George H. 912 West Armory Champaign, IL 61820 / US | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1999/39] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 97938431.0 | 19.08.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997US14591 | Priority number, date | US19960023573P | 19.08.1996 Original published format: US 23573 P | US19970055594P | 12.08.1997 Original published format: US 55594 P | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9807898 | Date: | 26.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944748 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/00, C25C7/00, H01M4/00, G21B1/00, C25B11/04 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
C25D17/10 (EP,US);
G21B3/00 (EP,US);
Y02E30/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/39] | C25B11/00, C25C7/00, H01M4/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/21] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SCHUPPENRESISTENTE MULTILAGENDÜNNFILMELEKTRODE UND ELEKTROLYTISCHE ZELLEN, DIE DIESE VERWENDEN | [1999/39] | English: | FLAKE-RESISTANT MULTILAYER THIN-FILM ELECTRODES AND ELECTROLYTIC CELLS INCORPORATING SAME | [1999/39] | French: | ELECTRODES A COUCHES MINCES, MULTICOUCHES ET RESISTANTES A L'ECAILLAGE ET CELLULES ELECTROLYTIQUES LES COMPORTANT | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 19.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 20.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Request for further processing for: | 29.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 29.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2006 | Decision despatched | 12.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2058842 (OLIN CORP) [A] 14,15,28,29 * page 1, line 51 - line 59 * * page 2, line 12 - line 37 * * page 2, line 53 - line 58 *; | [A]JPH01176086 ; | [A]US5372688 (PATTERSON JAMES A [US]) [A] 24,25 * column 1, line 50 - line 63 * * column 4, line 41 - line 60 * * figure 2 * | [DA] - MILEY G H ET AL, "ELECTROLYTIC CELL WITH MULTILAYER THIN-FILM ELECTRODES", FUSION TECHNOLOGY,US,AMERICAN NUCLEAR SOCIETY. LAGRANGE PARK, ILLINOIS, (19941201), vol. 26, no. 4T, PART 02, ISSN 0748-1896, pages 313 - 320, XP000489732 [DA] 14-16,18-23,27 * the whole document * | [A] - MILEY G H ET AL, "MULTILAYER THIN FILM ELECTRODES FOR COLD FUSION", FRONTIERS OF COLD FUSION,XX,XX, (1993), pages 659 - 662, XP002910912 [A] 14-16,18-23,27-29 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 34, Database accession no. 1989-244216, XP002149455 & JPH01176086 A 19890712 (PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD) [A] 15,16 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5164062 (BYRD CARL E [US], et al) |