EP0925115 - METHODS OF ANALYSIS/SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED Harston Mill Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED Harston Mill Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED Harston Mill Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGER, Colin, Dennis 25 Bentley Road Cambridge CB2 2AW / GB | 02 /
DAMES, Andrew, Nicholas 74 De Freville Avenue Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 1HU / GB | 03 /
PURVIS, Duncan, Ross 87 Mill Road Royston Hertfordshrie SG8 7AJ / GB | 04 /
SAFFORD, Nicholas, Archibald 61 Gwydir Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 1LG / GB | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97939098.6 | 10.09.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997GB02484 | Priority number, date | GB19960019093 | 12.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9619093 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810869 | Date: | 19.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925115 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925115 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B03C5/02, G01N33/487, C12M1/34 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
B03C5/028 (EP,US);
B03C5/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/26] | Title | German: | METHODEN FÜR ANALYSE/TRENNUNG | [1999/26] | English: | METHODS OF ANALYSIS/SEPARATION | [1999/26] | French: | PROCEDES D'ANALYSE/SEPARATION | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 04.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 02.05.2002 | PT | 02.08.2002 | IE | 10.09.2002 | [2003/42] |
Former [2003/21] | GR | 02.05.2002 | |
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 02.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS52105371 ; | [XA]WO9207657 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6 * page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 14, paragraph 3; figures 8-10; claims 1,2,16,22 * [A] 2,3,7,8; | [PX]WO9631282 (SCIENT GENERICS LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1,4,6 * page 3, line 1 - line 30 * * page 5, line 4 - line 11 ** page 7, line 4 - line 24; figure 1; claims 1,5 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19771220), vol. 001, no. 161, Database accession no. (M - 053), & JP52105371 A 19770903 (INOUE JAPAX RES INC) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [DA] - MASAO WASHIZU ET AL, "HANDLING BIOLOGICAL CELLS USING A FLUID INTEGRATED CIRCUIT", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, (19900301), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 352 - 358, XP000136707 [DA] 1,4,6 * page 355, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.54263 | [DA] - MASUDA S ET AL, "SEPARATION OF SMALL PARTICLES SUSPENDED IN LIQUID BY NONUNIFORM TRAVELING FIELD", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, (19870501), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 474 - 480, XP002005853 [DA] 1,4,6 * page 477, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 480, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 4 * |