EP0923799 - Frequency doubled laser with an intracavity nonlinear, quasi-phase matching element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/25] | LASER | ||
[2004/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cobolt AB Kräftriket 8 104 05 Stockholm / SE | [2005/05] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Cobolt AB Norrholmsvägen 122 132 31 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Laurell, Fredrik Noragardsvägen 52 182 34 Danderyd / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laurell, Fredrik Noragardsvägen 52 182 34 Danderyd / SE | [2001/11] |
Former [1999/25] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/25] | Henningsson, Gunnar AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97939284.2 | 02.09.1997 | [1999/25] | WO1997SE01466 | Priority number, date | SE19960003234 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: SE 9603234 | [1999/25] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810497 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923799 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923799 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/109, G02F1/37 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
H01S3/0627 (EP,US);
H01S3/109 (EP,US);
G02F1/3548 (EP,US);
H01S3/0604 (EP,US);
H01S3/0615 (EP,US);
H01S3/08036 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/25] | Title | German: | Frequenzverdoppelter Laser mit einem quasiphasenangepassten nichtlinearen Element innerhalb des Resonators | [2004/10] | English: | Frequency doubled laser with an intracavity nonlinear, quasi-phase matching element | [2004/06] | French: | Laser doublé en fréquence utilisant un élément non-linéaire de quasi-adaptation de phase dans la cavité laser | [2004/06] |
Former [1999/25] | LASER | ||
Former [1999/25] | LASER | ||
Former [1999/25] | LASER | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.1999 | Translation filed | 01.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 04.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2004 | BE | 03.11.2004 | CH | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | IT | 03.11.2004 | LI | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | DK | 03.02.2005 | SE | 03.02.2005 | ES | 14.02.2005 | [2008/08] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9009688 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [Y]US5289491 (DIXON GEORGE J [US]); | [Y]WO9506345 (LASER POWER CORP [US], et al); | [A]US5511085 (MARSHALL LARRY R [US]); | [Y]WO9618132 (LAURELL FREDRIK [SE]); | [AP]WO9636095 (I E OPTOMECH LTD [GB]); | [A]US5585962 (DIXON GEORGE J [US]) | [A] - OPTICS & PHOTONICS NEWS, November 1995, (.), ., "Microchip Lasers and Laser Arrays", page 16-19. | Examination | - TAIRA T. AND KOBAYASHI T., "Intracavity frequency doubling and Q-switching in diode-laser-pumped Nd:YVO4 lasers", APPLIED OPTICS, (19950820), vol. 34, no. 21, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.34.004298, pages 4298 - 4301, XP000517287 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.34.004298 |