EP0917581 - FUSION POLYPEPTIDES COM0PRISING AN IGE-BINDING DOMAIN AND A HSA COMPONENT, AND THEIR DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/11] | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/10] | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Vienna / AT | |||
Former [2001/32] | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunnerstrasse 59, Postfach 80 1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1999/21] | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunnerstrasse 59, Postfach 80 1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIGAN, Mary, Ellen 46 Junard Drive Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 02 /
LAKE, Philip 70 Brooklawn Drive Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 03 /
GRAM, Hermann Am Bischofsacker 20 D-79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2003/20] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1999/21] | Becker, Konrad, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 97940030.6 | 25.07.1997 | [1999/21] | WO1997EP04066 | Priority number, date | US19960690216 | 26.07.1996 Original published format: US 690216 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804718 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0917581 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0917581 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C07K19/00, C12N15/81, C12N15/85, A01K67/027, A61K38/16, G01N33/68, A61K48/00 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/765 (EP);
C12N15/64 (KR);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K14/70535 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/21] | Extension states | RO | 07.01.1999 | SI | 08.01.1999 | Title | German: | FUSIONSPOLYPEPTIDE DIE EINE IGE-BINDUNGSDOMÄNE UND EINE HSA-KOMPONENTE ENTHALTEN UND DEREN DIAGNOSTISCHE UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG | [1999/21] | English: | FUSION POLYPEPTIDES COM0PRISING AN IGE-BINDING DOMAIN AND A HSA COMPONENT, AND THEIR DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC USES | [1999/21] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE FUSION COMPRENANT UN DOMAINE DE LIAISON IGE ET UN COMPOSANT HSA, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS DIAGNOSTIQUES ET THERAPEUTIQUES | [1999/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 07.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | IE | 25.07.2008 | LU | 25.07.2008 | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/05] | DK | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 09.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8905352 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 ** claim - *; | [Y]WO9013653 (DELTA BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * example - * * claim - *; | [A]EP0499112 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y] - R. SABAN ET AL., "Allergens, IgE, mediators, inflammatory mechanisms.", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ST. LOUIS, MO, USA, (199411), vol. 94, no. 5, pages 836 - 843, XP000615476 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 836, column R, line 8 - page 837, column L, line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0091-6749(94)90151-1 | [A] - E. SCARSELLI ET AL., "Receptor phage. Display of functional domains of the high affinity IgE receptor on the M13 phage surface.", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19930823), vol. 329, no. 1-2, pages 223 - 226, XP002049202 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(93)80226-K | [A] - U. BLANK ET AL., "Complete structure and expression in transfected cells of high affinity IgE receptor.", NATURE, LONDON, GB, (19890112), vol. 337, pages 187 - 189, XP002049203 [A] 1-10 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/337187a0 |