EP0857119 - CONTROLLER FOR DEVICES DRIVEN BY LINEAR MOTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brückner Maschinenbau GmbH Königsberger Strasse 5-7 83313 Siegsdorf / DE | [1998/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OEDL, Günter Thumeggerstrasse 24 A-5020 Salzburg / AT | 02 /
KREINER, Rudolph Dammweg 11 D-83334 Inzell / DE | 03 /
ZINTZ, Wolfgang Spielwanger Strasse 27 D-83377 Vachendorf / DE | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/33] | Flach, Dieter Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Andrae Flach Haug Kneissl Bauer Schneider, Prinzregentenstrasse 24 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97940083.5 | 14.08.1997 | [1998/33] | WO1997EP04451 | Priority number, date | DE1996134449 | 26.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19634449 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808702 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857119 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857119 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/00 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
B60L15/005 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/33] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR LINEARMOTOR-GETRIEBENE EINRICHTUNGEN | [1998/33] | English: | CONTROLLER FOR DEVICES DRIVEN BY LINEAR MOTORS | [1998/33] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIFS ENTRAINES PAR MOTEUR LINEAIRE | [1998/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.07.2001 | IT | 11.07.2001 | BE | 31.08.2001 | CH | 31.08.2001 | LI | 31.08.2001 | [2008/08] |
Former [2003/06] | GB | 11.07.2001 | |
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 11.07.2001 | |
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 11.07.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8810188 (DU PONT [US]); | [DA]US4853602 (HOMMES WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]DE4106850 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [DA]US5274317 (UTLEY DANIEL E [US], et al); | [DA]US5530323 (BREITZMANN ROBERT J [US]) |