EP1009788 - CLEAR LIQUID FABRIC SOFTENING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMEYERE, Hugo, Jean, Marie Linthoutstraat 59 B-1785 Merchtem / BE | 02 /
DECLERQ, Marc, Johan Ringlaan 77 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 03 /
FRANKENBACH, Gayle, Marie 10010 Voyager Lane Cincinnati, OH 45252 / US | 04 /
WAHL, Errol, Hoffman 8021 Deershadow Lane Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2000/25] | Gault, Nathalie, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 97940563.6 | 18.08.1997 | [2000/25] | WO1997US14470 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909122 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009788 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1009788 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/00, C11D3/43, C11D1/835 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
C11D3/2048 (EP);
C11D1/835 (EP);
C11D3/0015 (EP);
C11D3/2044 (EP);
C11D3/43 (EP);
C11D1/44 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP);
C11D1/722 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | DURCHSICHTIGE FLÜSSIGE GEWEBEWEICHMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2000/25] | English: | CLEAR LIQUID FABRIC SOFTENING COMPOSITIONS | [2000/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ASSOUPLISSANTES LIQUIDES TRANSPARENTES | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Request for further processing for: | 12.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | FR | 15.06.2005 | IT | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | NL | 15.06.2005 | IE | 18.08.2005 | LU | 18.08.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | DE | 16.09.2005 | ES | 26.09.2005 | PT | 23.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 18.08.2005 | ||
LU | 18.08.2005 | ||
FR | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 18.08.2005 | ||
LU | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 18.08.2005 | ||
LU | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 18.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0043547 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 5; examples 2B-E,H; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0309052 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-12* page 3, line 35 - line 40; example -; claims 1-4 *; | [YD]WO9703169 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [YD] 1-12 * example - * |