EP0954817 - CONDITIONAL PURCHASE OFFER MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Priceline.Com Incorporated Five High Ridge Park Stamford, CT 06905-1326 / US | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKER, Jay, S. 124 Spectacle Lane Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | 02 /
SCHNEIER, Bruce 101 E. Minnehaha Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55419 / US | 03 /
SPARICO, Thomas, M. 115 Lockwood Road Riverside, CT 06878 / US | 04 /
CASE, T., Scott 29 Anthony Lane Darien, CT 06820 / US | 05 /
JORASCH, James, A. Apartment 5G, 25 Forest Street Stamford, CT 06901 / US | 06 /
VAN LUCHENE, Andrew, S. 13-2a Clarmore Drive Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | 07 /
TEDESCO, Daniel, E. 88 Barn Hill Road Monroe, CT 06468 / US | 08 /
JINDAL, Sanjay, K. 52 Village Walk Wilton, CT 06897 / US | 09 /
WEIR-JONES, Toby 3A 65 Prospect Street Stamford, CT 06901 / US | 10 /
LECH, Robert, R. 3 Valley View Drive 25 Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97940780.6 | 04.09.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997US15492 | Priority number, date | US19960707660 | 04.09.1996 Original published format: US 707660 | US19970889319 | 08.07.1997 Original published format: US 889319 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810361 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954817 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, H04L9/00, G07F7/10 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
G06Q50/14 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/025 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US);
G06Q20/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/201 (EP,US);
G06Q20/24 (EP,US);
G06Q20/403 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0207 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0273 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0611 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0637 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US);
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/08 (EP,US);
G06Q50/188 (EP,US);
G07F9/026 (EP,US);
Y10S707/944 (US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99942 (US);
Y10S707/99943 (US);
Y10S707/99945 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/45] | G06F17/60, H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Extension states | AL | 01.04.1999 | LT | 01.04.1999 | LV | 01.04.1999 | RO | 01.04.1999 | SI | 01.04.1999 | Title | German: | VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR KONDITIONELLE KAUFANGEBOTE | [1999/45] | English: | CONDITIONAL PURCHASE OFFER MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS | [1999/45] | French: | SYSTEMES DE GESTION D'OFFRES D'ACHAT CONDITIONNELLES | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 01.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/42] | 06.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 13.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0512702 (REUTERS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-198 * abstract * * page 7, line 16 - page 9, line 15 *; | [A]US5375055 (TOGHER MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-198 * abstract *; | [A]WO9516971 (OPEN MARKET INC [US]) [A] 2,3,5,6,19,20,34,35,99,181-183,191,193 * abstract * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 28 *; | [A]WO9613013 (OPEN MARKET INC [US]) [A] 2,3,5,6,19,20,34,35,99,181-183,191,193 * abstract ** page 2, line 7 - page 6, line 20 *; | [Y] - LAURA DEL ROSSO, "Marketel Says It Plans to Launch Air Fare Auction System in June", TRAVEL WEEKLY, REED TRAVEL GROUP, USA, (19910429), vol. 50, no. 34, XP002138748 [Y] 1-198 * the whole document * * page 2, line 13 - page 4, line 49 * | International search | [X]US4799156 (SHAVIT EYAL [US], et al); | [X]US4903201 (WAGNER SUSAN W [US]); | [X]US5021953 (WEBBER DAVID W [US], et al); | [A]US5191613 (GRAZIANO JAMES M [US], et al); | [Y]US5262941 (SALADIN EMERY F [US], et al); | [A]US5329589 (FRASER ALEXANDER G [US], et al); | [A]US5361199 (SHOQUIST KENNETH M [US], et al); | [Y]US5404291 (KERR GORDON S [US], et al); | [XP]US5557518 (ROSEN SHOLOM S [US]); | [XP]US5611052 (DYKSTRA DIANA R [US], et al) | [X] - LAURA DEL ROSSO, "Marketel Says it Plans to Launch Air Fare 'Auction' in June" Travel; Weekly, 29 April 1991. |