EP0923804 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DC MOTOR AND METHOD FOR FORMING A PERMANENT MAGNET FOR USE IN A DC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/25] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVED DC MOTORS AND MAGNETIC CLUTCHES | ||
[2006/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAXTOR CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2006/51] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Maxtor Corporation 500 McCarthy Bouöevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 501 Sycamore Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas California 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMAN, Albert, L., W. 4013 Ben Lomond Drive Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
LORIMER, Wendy, L. 39149 Guardino Drive 157 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97940848.1 | 04.09.1997 | [1999/25] | WO1997US15652 | Priority number, date | US19960711350 | 04.09.1996 Original published format: US 711350 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810504 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923804 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923804 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/00, H02K21/12, H02K1/12, H02K21/22 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
H02K15/03 (EP,US);
H02K1/2791 (EP,US);
H02K21/22 (EP,US);
H02K29/03 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/25] | H02K15/00, H02K21/12, H02K1/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GLEICHSTROMMOTORS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLEN EINES DAUERMAGNETS FÜR EINEN GLEICHSTROMMOTOR | [2006/10] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DC MOTOR AND METHOD FOR FORMING A PERMANENT MAGNET FOR USE IN A DC MOTOR | [2006/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN AIMANT PERMANENT POUR UN MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU | [2006/10] |
Former [1999/25] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBESSERTE GLEICHSTROMMOTOREN UND MAGNETISCHE KUPPLUNGEN | ||
Former [1999/25] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVED DC MOTORS AND MAGNETIC CLUTCHES | ||
Former [1999/25] | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DESTINES A DES MOTEURS A COURANT CONTINU ET A DES ACCOUPLEMENTS A AIMANT AMELIORES | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 05.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Request for further processing for: | 22.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2000 | 30.09.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07212994 ; | [A]GB2089584 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD) [A] 1,16,19 * abstract * * page 1, lines 61-119; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3730615 (MARINESCU MARLENE [DE], et al) [A] 1,16,19 * abstract * * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 51 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 15; figures 1-8 *; | [AX]DE3913276 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,19 * the whole document * [X] 16; | [A]US5298827 (SUGIYAMA TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 16 * column A * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 25 ** column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07212994 A 19950811 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,16,19 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5030864 (VAN HOUT HENRICUS M [NL], et al); | [X]US5355043 (KANEDA ISAO [JP]); | [A]US5418414 (ACKERMANN BERND [DE], et al); | [AP]US5652473 (DELAMARE JEROME [FR], et al) |