EP0862340 - IMAGE SIGNAL PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imard K.K. 16-6, Nishi-shinjuku 6-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 166 / JP | [1998/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Yasuhiro 10-9, Toyoda 1-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Godsill, John Kenneth, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [1998/36] | Application number, filing date | 97941185.7 | 17.09.1997 | [1998/36] | WO1997JP03277 | Priority number, date | JP19960244726 | 17.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24472696 | JP19970174073 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: JP 17407397 | [1998/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812879 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862340 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H04N13/261 (EP);
H04N13/221 (EP,US);
H04N13/139 (EP);
H04N13/15 (EP);
H04N13/161 (EP);
H04N13/167 (EP);
H04N13/189 (EP);
H04N13/211 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP);
H04N13/296 (EP);
H04N13/239 (EP);
H04N13/324 (EP);
H04N13/337 (EP);
H04N13/341 (EP);
H04N13/344 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/36] | H04N13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/36] | Title | German: | BILDSIGNALVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT | [1998/36] | English: | IMAGE SIGNAL PROCESSOR | [1998/36] | French: | UNITE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX IMAGE | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1998 | Translation filed | 08.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 08.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 01.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/49] | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9518512 (LEICA AG [CH], et al); | [A]EP0665697 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,7 * page 5, column 7, line 25 - page 6, column 10, line 6; figure 4 *; | [E]EP0918439 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [E] 1,3,4,7 * page 2, column 2, line 31 - page 3, column 4, line 34; figure 55 * * page 10, column 18, line 46 - page 11, column 19, line 10; figure 1 * * page 16, column 29, line 35 - column 30, line 43; figure 20 * | International search | [Y]JPS6346091 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP); | [Y]JPS63181593 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JPS63219293 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPH07212799 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [Y]JPH0830806 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |