EP0871273 - BATTERY PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Hiroyuki, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Koichi, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97941210.3 | 22.09.1997 | [1998/42] | WO1997JP03375 | Priority number, date | JP19960251493 | 24.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25149396 | [1998/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813923 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871273 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J7/04, H02J7/10, H02H7/18 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
H02J7/0031 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (KR);
H02J7/00302 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00304 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00306 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/42] | Title | German: | BATTERIESCHUTZSCHALTUNG | [1998/42] | English: | BATTERY PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT | [1998/42] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION DE BATTERIE | [1998/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1998 | Translation filed | 14.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 14.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4792743 (TSUJINO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column W *; | [A]US5142215 (MATHISON LESLIE C [US]) [A] 1,6 * column W *; | [A]EP0588615 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS372267Y ; | [A]JPS552818B ; | [A]JPS5543750Y ; | [A]JPH04304015 (TELEMECANIQUE); | [A]JPH0533645U ; | [A]JPH06303728 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |