EP0928224 - DISPENSER HAVING FOAMED OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAUFMAN PRODUCTS INC. 470 Morden Road, Suite 103 Oakville Ontario L6K 3W4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states KAUFMAN PRODUCTS INC. 470 Morden Road, Suite 103 Oakville, Ontario L6K 3W4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUFMAN, John, G. 320 Lakeview Avenue Burlington, Ontario L7N 1Z1 / CA | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Armand, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Schmitt, Armand, et al Office de brevets, Ernest T. Freylinger, 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 97941759.9 | 26.09.1997 | [1999/28] | WO1997CA00702 | Priority number, date | US19960720109 | 27.09.1996 Original published format: US 720109 | [1999/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813144 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928224 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/04, B05B7/00, B05B11/06, A47K5/14, G01F11/26, A47K5/122 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
A47K5/122 (EP,US);
A47K5/14 (EP,US);
B05B11/043 (EP,US);
B05B11/046 (EP,US);
B05B11/048 (EP,US);
B05B11/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/28] | Title | German: | SCHAUMSPENDER | [1999/28] | English: | DISPENSER HAVING FOAMED OUTPUT | [1999/28] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUIT SOUS FORME DE MOUSSE | [1999/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 03.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/41] | 08.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2000 | 30.09.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0557243 (STEINER CO INT SA [CH]) [X] 1,2,16 * abstract * [Y] 8-11,2-7,12-15; | [DY]EP0381884 (KAUFMAN JOHN GEORGE) [DY] 2-7,12-15 * abstract *; | [Y]FR1539702 (STERWIN AG) [Y] 8-11 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 5; figures 1-16 *; | [XA]EP0626321 (VALOIS SA [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 8; | [XA]GB2193904 (BALLARD MED PROD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3,8; | [XA]US4420098 (BENNETT ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 3; | [X]US3628700 (DODOGHUE ROBERT J) [X] 1-11 * column W * | by applicant | US4324349 | US4635828 | US4645097 | US5033653 |