EP1017326 - ARTICULATED EXTERNAL ORTHOPEDIC FIXATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/28] | ARTICULATED EXTERNAL ORTHOPEDIC FIXATION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE | ||
[2004/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alphatec Manufacturing Inc. 6110 Corte del Cedro Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2004/19] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Tosic, Aleksandar Unit X, 2731 Glendale Avenue Toledo, OH 43614 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tosic, Aleksandar 110 West Pine Big Rapids, MI 49307 / US | [2004/19] |
Former [2000/28] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 97942146.8 | 10.09.1997 | [2000/28] | WO1997IB01250 | Priority number, date | US19960717224 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: US 717224 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9812975 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1017326 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/62, A61B17/66, A61B17/60 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
A61B17/62 (EP,US);
A61B17/6441 (EP,US);
A61B17/6466 (EP,US);
A61B17/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [2000/28] | Title | German: | GELENKIGES ÄUSSERES ORTHOPÄDISCHES FIXIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2004/26] | English: | ARTICULATED EXTERNAL ORTHOPEDIC FIXATION SYSTEM | [2004/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE FIXATION ORTHOPEDIQUE EXTERNE ARTICULE | [2004/26] |
Former [2000/28] | GELENKIGES ÄUSSERES ORTHOPÄDISCHES FIXIERUNGSSYSTEM UND METHODE ZU DESSEN GEBRAUCH | ||
Former [2000/28] | ARTICULATED EXTERNAL ORTHOPEDIC FIXATION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE | ||
Former [2000/28] | SYSTEME DE FIXATION ORTHOPEDIQUE EXTERNE ARTICULE ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.1999 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/02] | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | Request for further processing for: | 24.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0029298 (ACE ORTHOPEDIC MFG [US]) [Y] 22-31 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [YA]DE9016227U (HOWMEDICA) [Y] 22-31 * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]DE4421223 (FISCHER JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1,22* figure 1 * |