EP0859891 - INSTALLATION FOR SEPARATING VOLATILE LIQUIDS FROM WATER MIXED WITH SUCH LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Käsch Trenntechnik GmbH Dieselstrasse 33 44805 Bochum / DE | [1998/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÄHMANN, Peter Heintzmannstrasse 172 D-44801 Bochum / DE | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Henfling, Fritz Schanzenweg 18a 44227 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Henfling, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Beurhausstrasse 7 44137 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 97942810.9 | 05.09.1997 | [1998/35] | WO1997DE01982 | Priority number, date | DE1996136771 | 10.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19636771 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9811306 | Date: | 19.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859891 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0859891 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/16 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
E03F5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/35] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON LEICHTFLÜSSIGKEITEN VON MIT SOLCHEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN VERSETZTEM WASSER | [1998/35] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR SEPARATING VOLATILE LIQUIDS FROM WATER MIXED WITH SUCH LIQUIDS | [1998/35] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR SEPARER DES LIQUIDES VOLATILS DE L'EAU MELANGEE A DE TELS LIQUIDES | [1998/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 26.08.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.12.1999 | GB | 22.12.1999 | SE | 22.12.1999 | DK | 22.03.2000 | PT | 22.03.2000 | [2003/46] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 22.12.1999 | |
GB | 22.12.1999 | ||
SE | 22.12.1999 | ||
PT | 22.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 22.12.1999 | |
SE | 22.12.1999 | ||
PT | 22.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | GB | 22.12.1999 | |
PT | 22.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 22.03.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR655533 (DABEG MASCHINENFABRIKS AG) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE520773 (OTTO HERBERGER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2426288 (TESTAERT PIERRE [FR]); | [A]DE2838559 (BUDERUS AG) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |