EP0929626 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION OR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALDARELLI, Jennifer, Leupoin 9797 Fawncreek Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | 02 /
ASKEW, Stuart, Clive 17 Mayfair Road, West Jesmond Newcastle-upon-Type NE2 3DN / GB | 03 /
SORRIE, Graham, Alexander 14 Curlew Hill, Morpeth Northumberland NE61 3SH / GB | 04 /
HALL, Robin, Gibson 27 Blackfriars Court, Stowell Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 4XB / GB | 05 /
HENSMAN, Tiffany, Alice 44 Deneside Court, Selbournd Gardens, Jesmond Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE2 1JW / GB | 06 /
TANTAWY, Hossam Woodend, Fawdon Walk, Kingston Park Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE13 7AW / GB | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97943400.8 | 22.09.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997US16705 | Priority number, date | GB19960019928 | 24.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9619928 | GB19970013946 | 02.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9713946 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813452 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929626 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D3/37, C11D17/06 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C11D3/3723 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D3/3715 (EP);
C11D3/3719 (EP);
C11D3/3761 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/29] | C11D1/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG ODER WASCHMITTELKOMPONENTE | [1999/29] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION OR COMPONENT | [1999/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES OU COMPOSANT DE CES DERNIERES | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9744417 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [E] 1-27 * the whole document * * especially Ex. 4 and 7 * | International search | [X]US4664848 |