EP0928387 - SELF CLOSING FAUCET WITH TIMING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCO CORPORATION 21001 Van Born Road Taylor, MI 48180 / US | [1999/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Alfred, C. 137 Myers Lake Drive Noblesville, IN 46060 / US | 02 /
BRYM, Stanley, J. 341 Greenwoods Road Torrington, CT 06790 / US | 03 /
LUMB, Gunther, H. 28 Freedom Drive Collinsville, CT 06022 / US | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP St Nicholas Chambers, Amen Corner Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 1PE / GB | ||
Former [1999/28] | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97943601.1 | 26.09.1997 | [1999/28] | WO1997US17303 | Priority number, date | US19960721288 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: US 721288 | US19970825965 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: US 825965 | [1999/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813632 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928387 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928387 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16K21/04, F16K31/48 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
F16K21/04 (EP);
F16K21/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/28] | F16K21/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/28] | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHLIESSENDE ARMATUR MIT ZEITSCHALTWERK | [1999/28] | English: | SELF CLOSING FAUCET WITH TIMING MECHANISM | [1999/28] | French: | ROBINET A FERMETURE AUTOMATIQUE DOTE D'UN MECANISME DE MINUTERIE | [1999/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 01.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE8220565U (ZEIT-ARMATUREN) [X] 1,6 * page 4, line 1 - line 24; claims 1-6 * [A] 12; | [A]DE2847751 (KARRER WEBER & CIE AG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4341620 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2098815 ; | [A]US3063297 ; | [A]US3807451 |