EP0937255 - OPTICAL QUANTIFICATION OF ANALYTES IN MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA Room 331, IRC Building, 2194 Health Sciences Mall Vancouver British Columbia, V6T 1Z3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA Room 331, IRC Building, 2194 Health Sciences Mall Vancouver, British Columbia, V6T 1Z3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROOKS, Donald, Elliott 3989 West 19th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1C9 / CA | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97943703.5 | 09.10.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997CA00751 | Priority number, date | US19960727998 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: US 727998 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9815831 | Date: | 16.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937255 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N21/17 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE QUANTIFIZIERUNGSANALYTEN IN MEMBRANE | [1999/34] | English: | OPTICAL QUANTIFICATION OF ANALYTES IN MEMBRANES | [1999/34] | French: | QUANTIFICATION OPTIQUE D'UNE SUBSTANCE A ANALYSER PRESENTE DANS UNE MEMBRANE | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 22.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/49] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS62200244 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880218), vol. 12, no. 53, Database accession no. (P - 668), & JP62200244 A 19870903 (NIPPON MASAHIKO COMPANY LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7,10,18 * abstract * | [X] - A. VACHEREAU, "Transparency of nitrocellulose membranes with Triton X-114.", ELECTROPHORESIS, WEINHEIM FRG, (1989), vol. 10, pages 524 - 527, XP002053617 [X] 1,2,5,7,10,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.1150100713 | [AD] - A.D. KLIMOV ET AL., "Improved immunochromatographic format for competitive-type assays.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WINSTON-SALEM NC USA, (1995), vol. 41, no. 9, page 1360, XP002053450 [AD] 1-18 * the whole document * |