EP0936875 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A FOOD FLAVORING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/34] | METHOD OF PRODUCING FOOD FLAVORING AGENT | ||
[2002/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogsho̸jvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOFOED, Lene Venke Novo Nordisk a/s, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 02 /
FISCHER, Morten Sonder Boulevard 45, 4. tv. DK-1720 Copenhagen V. / DK | 03 /
NIELSEN, Per Munk Novo Nordisk a/s, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 04 /
POMMER, Klaus Novo Nordisk a/s, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [1999/34] | Application number, filing date | 97943792.8 | 13.10.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997DK00443 | Priority number, date | DK19960001208 | 30.10.1996 Original published format: DK 120896 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9818342 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936875 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936875 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/34, A23L1/23, // A23L1/227 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
A23J3/346 (EP);
A23L27/24 (EP);
A23L27/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEWÜRZMITTELS FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTEL | [2002/06] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A FOOD FLAVORING AGENT | [2002/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN AGENT AROMATISANT ALIMENTAIRE | [1999/34] |
Former [1999/34] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEWÜRZMITTEL FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTEL | ||
Former [1999/34] | METHOD OF PRODUCING FOOD FLAVORING AGENT | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Request for further processing for: | 03.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.01.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2003 | BE | 25.06.2003 | FI | 25.06.2003 | IT | 25.06.2003 | GR | 25.09.2003 | PT | 25.09.2003 | ES | 22.12.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 25.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5100679 (DELRUE RITA M [NL]); | [A]US5141757 (HO DAC THANG [CH], et al); | [A]WO9425580 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [Y]WO9613988 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) |