EP1001736 - STARCH BINDING DOMAINS (SBDs) FOR ORAL CARE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogsho̸jvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUGLSANG, Claus, Crone Novo Nordisk a/s,Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 02 /
TSUCHIYA, Rie Novo Nordisk a/s,Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2000/21] | Application number, filing date | 97943795.1 | 13.10.1997 | [2000/21] | WO1997DK00446 | Priority number, date | DK19960001128 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: DK 112896 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9816190 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001736 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, C12N9/28 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
A61K8/66 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/2417 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/21] | Title | German: | STÄRKEBINDUNGSDOMÄNEN FÜR ZAHNPFLEGEMITTEL | [2000/21] | English: | STARCH BINDING DOMAINS (SBDs) FOR ORAL CARE PRODUCTS | [2000/21] | French: | DOMAINES DE LIAISON A L'AMIDON POUR PRODUITS DE SOINS BUCCO-DENTAIRES | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 21.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.10.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/16] | 21.11.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP63104908 ; | [X]GB1265468 ; | [A]WO9206191 (PROTEIN ENG CORP [US]); | [A]WO9322341 (FORSYTH DENTAL INFIRMARY [US]) | [X] - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CA, Accession Number 110:121130R, SHISEIDO CO., LTD., "Manufacture of Chewing Gum Containing Amylase and(or) Glucoamylase for the Prevention of Dental Caries"; & JP,A,63 104 908, (10-05-1988)., & JP63104908 A 00000000 |