EP0932683 - ATTENUATED MICROORGANISM STRAINS EXPRESSING HPV PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fondation pour le perfectionnement et la recherche en gynécologie-Obstétrique Avenue Pierre-Decker 1011 Lausanne / CH | [2004/32] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAEFLIGER, Denise, Nardelli Chemin de Champ-Rond 53 bis CH-1010 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
KRAEHENBUHL, Jean-Pierre Sur-la-Croix CH-1812 Rivaz / CH | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Besse, François ANDRE ROLAND SA Chemin des Charmettes 9 P.O. Box 5107 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Besse, François ANDRE ROLAND IPS, Avenue Tissot 20, P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [1999/31] | Dolan, Anthony Patrick BTG International Ltd., 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97944023.7 | 07.10.1997 | [1999/31] | WO1997GB02740 | Priority number, date | GB19960021091 | 09.10.1996 Original published format: GB 9621091 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9815631 | Date: | 16.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932683 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/37, C12N15/62, C12N15/74, C12N1/21, C07K14/025, A61K39/12, A61K31/70, G01N33/569, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:42) | [1999/31] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/74 (EP,US);
A61K2039/51 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/20022 (EP,US);
C12N2710/20023 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US);
Y10S977/804 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/31] | Title | German: | ATTENUIERTE MIKROORGANISMEN, DIE HPV-PROTEINE EXPRIMIEREN | [1999/31] | English: | ATTENUATED MICROORGANISM STRAINS EXPRESSING HPV PROTEINS | [1999/31] | French: | SOUCHES DE MICRO-ORGANISMES ATTENUEES EXPRIMANT DES PROTEINES VPH | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/12] | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9208486 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]); | [A]WO9403615 (MEDEVA HOLDINGS BV [NL], et al); | [Y]WO9611274 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US]); |