EP0956051 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PULMONARY GENE DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valentis Inc. 1013 Centre Road Wilmington, New Castle Delaware / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Valentis Inc. 1013 Centre Road Wilmington, New Castle, Delaware / US | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Genemedicine, Inc. 8301 New Trials Drive The Woodlands, TX 77381-4248 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILLAI, Raviraj, S. Apt. 2203, 333 Holly Creek Court The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | 02 /
ROLLAND, Alain 22 Driftoak Circle The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97944303.3 | 11.09.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US16074 | Priority number, date | US19960026183P | 12.09.1996 Original published format: US 26183 P | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810796 | Date: | 19.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956051 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON GENEN AN DIE LUNGE | [1999/46] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PULMONARY GENE DELIVERY | [1999/46] | French: | COMPOSES ET PROCEDES DE LIBERATION DE GENES DANS LES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 12.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9312756 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 38-40 * page 4, line 2 - line 11 * * page 6, line 12 - page 9, line 22 * * page 25, line 3 - page 32, line 24 * [A] 1-37; | [XA]WO9312240 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 38-40 * page 5, line 13 - line 23 * * page 9, line 31 - page 12, line 25 * * page 23, line 6 - page 27, line 27 * [A] 1-37; | [A]WO9309130 (XOMA CORP [US]) [A] * page 3, line 2 - line 6 * * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 7 * * page 20, line 1 - line 23 *; | [A] - RENZ ET AL, "SPECIFIC VBETA T CELL SUBSETS MEDIATE THE IMMEDIATE HYPERSENSITIVITY RESPONSE TO RAGWEED ALLERGEN", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 151, pages 1907 - 1917, XP002050934 [A] * page 1907 * * abstract * |