EP0888060 - HERBICIDAL AND PLANT GROWTH REGULANT COMPOSITIONS AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGIN, Ralph, W. 17643 Crossing Boulevard Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | 02 /
SAUER, Joe, D. 15553 Waywood Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97944559.0 | 26.09.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997US17508 | Priority number, date | US19960720519 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: US 720519 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814060 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888060 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/20, A01N25/30, C11D1/835 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
A01N25/30 (EP,US);
A01N57/20 (EP,US);
Y10S516/07 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N57/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N57/20, A01N25/30 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [1999/01] | Title | German: | HERBIZIDE UND PFLANZENWACHSTUMSREGULIERENDE MITTEL UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [1999/01] | English: | HERBICIDAL AND PLANT GROWTH REGULANT COMPOSITIONS AND THE USE THEREOF | [1999/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS HERBICIDES ET REGULATRICES DE LA CROISSANCE DES VEGETAUX ET UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTE | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 13.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0733305 (MONSANTO EUROPE SA [BE]) [A] 1-29 * page 3 - page 4 *; | [A]EP0274369 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-29 * page 2, line 1 - line 33 * * see page 3, lines 23-25,38-42 and 60-63;; examples II,VIIC,VIIE *; | [A]EP0483095 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-29 * page 2 - page 3, line 15 * * page 3, line 43 - line 45; examples 1-18 *; | [A]US4174304 (FLANAGAN JOHN J [US]) [A] 30 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0651048 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 30 * page 2 - page 3, line 18 * |