EP0942683 - PHOTOACOUSTIC BREAST SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optosonics, Inc. 7534 Noel Road Indianapolis, IN 46278 / US | [1999/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUGER, Robert, A. 7534 Noel Road Indianapolis, IN 46278 / US | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 97944607.7 | 01.10.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997US17832 | Priority number, date | US19960719736 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: US 719736 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814118 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942683 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942683 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, A61B8/08 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
A61B5/0095 (EP,US);
A61B5/0091 (EP,US);
A61B5/0507 (EP);
A61B5/4312 (EP,US);
A61B8/4281 (EP,US);
A61B5/7239 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/38] | A61B8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/38] | Title | German: | PHOTOAKUSTISCHE MAMMA-ABTASTVORRICHTUNG | [1999/38] | English: | PHOTOACOUSTIC BREAST SCANNER | [1999/38] | French: | SCANNER PHOTO-ACOUSTIQUE DE TISSU MAMMAIRE | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 06.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 15.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2008 | BE | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | IT | 17.09.2008 | NL | 17.09.2008 | IE | 01.10.2008 | LU | 01.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | ES | 28.12.2008 | PT | 17.02.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
LU | 01.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0018771 (ONTARIO CANCER INST [CA]) [Y] 1,17,20,21,37,40,41 * page 2, line 25 - page 7, line 7; tables 1-4 *[A] 5,7,24,26; | [YA]WO8300009 (COMMW OF AUSTRALIA [AU]) [Y] 1,17,20,21,37,40,41 * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 11; table 1 * [A] 7,9,18,26,28,29,38; | [YA]EP0582384 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,17,20,21,37,40,41 * abstract * * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 7 * * page 6, line 14 - line 19; tables 1,2 * [A] 14,16,32,33 | International search | [A]US4255971 (ROSENCWAIG ALLAN); | [A]US4267732 (QUATE CALVIN F); | [A]US4874251 (THOMAS ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US5170666 (LARSEN LAWRENCE E [US]); | [AP]US5657754 (ROSENCWAIG ALLAN [US]) | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | - "Q.X. Chen et al.: "Photo-acoustic probe for intra-arterial imaging and therapy", Electronics Letter, Vol. 29, No. 18, 2 Sept 1993, pages 1632-1633" | - "R.A. Kruger et al: "Photoacoustic ultrasound (PAUS) - Reconstruction tomography", Med. Phys. 22(10), Oct. 1995, pages 1605-1609" |