EP0923614 - METHOD FOR PREPARING POLY-P-DIOXANONE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michigan State University 238 Administration Building East Lansing, Michigan 48824 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Michigan State University 238 Administration Building East Lansing, Michigan 48824 / US | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSCHNER, Thomas, Clayton 2211 Woodland Drive Richmond, TX 77469 / US | 02 /
GWYN, David, Eric 6502 Bria Bayou Houston, TX 77072 / US | 03 /
VEITH, Cary, Alan 1506 Emerald Springs Court Houston, TX 77094 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97944815.6 | 29.08.1997 | [1999/25] | WO1997EP04730 | Priority number, date | US19960697805 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: US 697805 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808887 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923614 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/664, C08G63/91 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
C08G63/664 (EP,US);
C08G63/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLY-P-DIOXANON | [1999/25] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING POLY-P-DIOXANONE POLYMER | [1999/25] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PREPARER UN POLYMERE DE POLY-P-DIOXANONE | [1999/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2000 | 31.08.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4653497 (BEZWADA RAO S [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, lines 9-55; examples 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]US4643191 (BEZWADA RAO S [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, lines 1-67; examples 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0710684 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, paragraph L * * column 12, paragraph 2; claim 1 *; | [A]FR1216828 (INVENTA AG) [A] 1 * page 2, column R, lines 11-22; claims 1-10 *; | [AD]US3645941 (SNAPP THOMAS C, et al) [AD] 1 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]US3063967 (SCHULTZ HERMAN S) [AD] 1 * column 2, lines 24-60; claim 1 * | [Y] - CHRISTEN, H.R., Grundlagen der Org. Chem.Teil 1, AARAU, SALLE, (1977), XP002052000 [Y] 1-10 * page 289 * |