EP0929548 - SUBSTITUTED CARBAMOYL TRIAZOLES AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANN, Ernst Falkenstrasse 6a D-67373 Dudenhofen / DE | 02 /
ZAGAR, Cyrill Georg-Herwegh-Strasse 31 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
KARDORFF, Uwe D 3.4 D-68159 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
MISSLITZ, Ulf Am Herzel 40 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 05 /
WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto Mausbergweg 58 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 06 /
WALTER, Helmut Grünstadter Strasse 82 D-67283 Obrigheim / DE | 07 /
HAMPRECHT, Gerhard Rote-Turm-Strasse 28 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | [1999/29] | Application number, filing date | 97944858.6 | 09.09.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997EP04902 | Priority number, date | DE1996138245 | 19.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19638245 | [1999/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812193 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929548 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929548 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D411/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D419/12, A01N47/38 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A01N47/38 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1999/29] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE CARBAMOYLTRIAZOLE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE | [1999/29] | English: | SUBSTITUTED CARBAMOYL TRIAZOLES AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES | [1999/29] | French: | CARBAMOYLTRIAZOLES SUBSTITUES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]EP0140194 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DXY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0422369 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0225175 (FISONS PLC [GB]) [X] 7 * example 45B *; | [X]US5521186 (HEERES JAN [BE], et al) [X] 7 * siehe Spalten 17-20, Tabelle 6, Verbindungen 76, 83, 84 und 86 *; | [X] - P. RADDATZ ET AL., "Renin inhibitors containing new P1-P1' dipeptide mimetics with heterocycles in P1'", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON DC, US, (19920918), vol. 35, no. 19, pages 3525 - 36, XP002050635 [X] 7 * siehe Seite 3526, Schema II, Verbindung 10f * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00097a010 |