EP0931279 - A DEVICE FOR STABILIZING OF A REMOTELY CONTROLLED SENSOR, LIKE A CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYTECH AB Post Box 20 640 32 Malmköping / SE | [1999/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEGERSTRÖM, Torbjörn Österäng S-640 32 Malmköping / SE | 02 /
NOREN, Kjell Lilla Kova S-640 32 Malmköping / SE | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Forssell, Gunilla Angelica Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Forssell, Gunilla Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97945134.1 | 30.09.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997SE01650 | Priority number, date | SE19960003716 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: SE 9603716 | [1999/30] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9816871 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0931279 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/56, G02B27/04 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
F16M11/08 (EP,US);
H04N23/6812 (EP,US);
F16M11/18 (EP,US);
F16M11/2014 (EP,US);
G02B27/64 (EP,US);
G03B15/006 (EP,US);
G08B13/1963 (EP,US);
G08B13/1965 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/30] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR STABILISATION EINER FERNSTEUERSCHALTUNG, WIE EINE KAMERA | [1999/30] | English: | A DEVICE FOR STABILIZING OF A REMOTELY CONTROLLED SENSOR, LIKE A CAMERA | [1999/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STABILISATION D'UN CAPTEUR COMMANDE A DISTANCE COMME UNE CAMERA | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1998 | Translation filed | 03.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 03.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/47] | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2000 | 30.09.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4973144 (MALIGE JEAN [FR]); | [A]US5237450 (STROEMBERG ROLF [SE]) |