EP0931171 - METHOD OF MAKING CEMENTED CARBIDE WITH BINDER PHASE ENRICHED SURFACE ZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Aktiebolag (publ) 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [1999/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDSKOG, Per Staffan Stallares Väg 17 S-125 35 Älvsjö / SE | 02 /
GUSTAFSON, Per Stuvstavägen 7 S-141 40 Huddinge / SE | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Taquist, Lennart, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE | Application number, filing date | 97945149.9 | 09.10.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997SE01690 | Priority number, date | SE19960003758 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: SE 9603758 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9816665 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0931171 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0931171 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C22C29/08 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
C22C29/08 (EP,US);
B22F3/101 (EP,US);
B22F2201/02 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12056 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F2207/03 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10, B22F2201/02, B22F2201/20, B22F2201/02 (US,EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F3/101, B22F2201/02, B22F2201/20 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SINTERKARBID MIT BINDERPHASEANGEREICHERTER OBERFLÄCHENZONE | [1999/30] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING CEMENTED CARBIDE WITH BINDER PHASE ENRICHED SURFACE ZONE | [1999/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARBURE METALLIQUE AYANT UNE ZONE DE SURFACE ENRICHIE EN PHASE DE LIANT | [2002/27] |
Former [1999/30] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARBURE METALLIQUE AYANT UNE ZONE DE SURFACE ENRICHIE PAR PHASE DE LIANT | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 13.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.01.2003 | IT | 29.01.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 29.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4277283 (TOBIOKA MASAAKI, et al); | [X]US4548786 (YOHE WARREN C [US]); | [X]US4649084 (HALE THOMAS E [US], et al); | [X]WO9317140 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [X]US5484468 (OESTLUND AKE [SE], et al) | Examination | EP0737756 |