EP0929829 - RETROREFLECTIVE SHEETING WITH EMBEDDED RETROREFLECTIVE ELEMENTS IN A BINDER LAYER WITH SHAPE MEMORY AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORIUMI, Naoyuki P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HATA, Michiru P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/29] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97945434.5 | 01.10.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997US17736 | Priority number, date | JP19960260603 | 01.10.1996 Original published format: JP 26060396 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814803 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929829 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929829 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/124, G02B5/128, B29D11/00 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
B29C70/74 (EP,US);
G02B5/124 (EP,KR,US);
B29D11/00615 (EP,US);
G02B5/128 (EP,US);
B29K2105/16 (EP,US);
B29K2995/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/29] | Title | German: | RETROREFLEKTIERENDES BAHNENMATERIAL MIT EINGEBETTETEN RETROREFLEKTIERENDEN ELEMENTEN IN EINER BINDEMITTELSCHICHT MIT FORMGEDÄCHTNIS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2003/31] | English: | RETROREFLECTIVE SHEETING WITH EMBEDDED RETROREFLECTIVE ELEMENTS IN A BINDER LAYER WITH SHAPE MEMORY AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE SAME | [1999/29] | French: | REVETEMENT RETROREFLECHISSANT A ELEMENTS RETROREFLECHISSANTS INTEGRES DANS UNE COUCHE LIANTE A EFFET MEMOIRE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1999/29] |
Former [1999/29] | RETROREFLEKTIERENDE FOLIE MIT EINGEBETTETEN RETROREFLEKTIERENDEN ELEMENTEN IN EINER FORMGEDÄCHTNIS-BINDESCHICHT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 07.11.2003 | [2004/31] | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5316406 (WYCKOFF CHARLES W [US]) [DA] 1,2,6,8,9,11,13 * column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-6; examples 1-4 *; | [A]US4712867 (MALEK FRITZ J [US]) [A] 1,6,8,9,11,13 * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0683268 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,5,6,8,9,11,13 * column 3, line 43 - column 11, line 49; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US3005382 (VICTOR WEBER) [DA] 1,2,5-9,11-13 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 26; figures 1,2; examples 1,5 *; | [A]EP0672921 (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 30 - page 8, line 14; figure 1 *; | [DA]US4025159 (MCGRATH JOSEPH M) [DA] 1-13 * column 3, line 23 - column 6, line 26; figures 1-8; examples 1,2,11 *; | [DA]JPS5346371 (KYOWA LEATHER CLOTH) [DA] 1,5,6,9,11 * abstract *; | [DA]JPS5565524 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800805), vol. 004, no. 108, Database accession no. (M - 024), & JP55065524 A 19800517 (KANTO LEATHER KK) [DA] 1,6,9,11 * abstract * |