EP1007012 - TASTE-MASKED MICROCAPSULE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurand, Incorporated 845 Center Drive Vandalia, OH 45377 / US | [2009/23] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states CIMA LABS INC. 10.000 Valley View Road Eden Prairie, MN 55344-9361 / US | ||
For all designated states SRI INTERNATIONAL 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025-3493 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEND, David, R. 454 9th Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
NG, Steven 1664 18th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 03 /
SARABIA, Rafael, E. 31 Cromwell Drive Chester, NJ 07930 / US | 04 /
WEBER, Thomas, P. 925 Scenic Drive Shoreview, MN 53126 / US | 05 /
GEOFFROY, Jean-Marie 441 Signal Lane Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson, et al Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97945437.8 | 01.10.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US17752 | Priority number, date | US19960027170P | 01.10.1996 Original published format: US 27170 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814179 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007012 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K9/58, A61K9/62 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/5026 (EP,US);
A61K9/50 (KR);
A61K31/341 (EP,US);
A61K9/5042 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61K9/0007 (EP,US);
A61K9/2081 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | GESCHMACKSMASKIERTE MIKROKAPSEL ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2000/25] | English: | TASTE-MASKED MICROCAPSULE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE | [2000/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS EN MICROCAPSULE A MASQUAGE DE GOUT ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2000/24] |
Former [2000/24] | GESCHMAKSMASKIERTE MIKROKAPSEL ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 30.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4460563 (CALANCHI MASSIMO [IT]) [X] 1-8,11-14,23 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 46 * * column 4, lines 20-54 * * column 6; example 7 * * claims 1-16 *; | [DX]US4542042 (SAMEJIMA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [DX] 1,3,5-13,23,25-31,36-44 * column 2, lines 10-23,42-66 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, lines 7,20-32 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 60 *; | [X]EP0239361 (KINAFORM TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5-11,23,25-29,35,37,39-42 * page 3, lines 15,16,27-30,44-46 * * page 4, lines 42-44 * * page 6, lines 55-63; example 1 *; | [X]CA2068366 (FAULDING F H & CO LTD [AU]) [X] 1,2,9-24 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 20 * * page 4, lines 15-23 * * page 8, lines 2-37 * * page 16, lines 5-9 * * claims 1-8,28 *; | [X]WO9408576 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,12-18,23,24 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, lines 1,18-22 * * page 6, lines 20-25 * * page 7, lines 1-4 * * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 7 *; | [X]WO9427596 (RHONE POULENC RORER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,9,11,17-23 * page 3, lines 1-19 * * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 2 * * page 10 - page 11; example 1 * * page 12 - page 13; example 3 ** claims 1-12 *; | [X]EP0724880 (EURAND AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5-11,17,23,25-29,36,37,39-42 * page 2, lines 3-10,45-50 * * page 3, lines 1-47; example 1 * * page 4, lines 15-17 * * claims 1-11 *; | US5622723 [ ] (BETTMAN MARIE J [US], et al); | [X] - CHATTARAJ, SARAT C. ET AL, "Effect of formulation variables on the preparation and in vitro - in vivo evaluation of cimetidine release from ethyl cellulose micropellets", DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, (1990), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 283 - 293, XP008056204 [X] 1-14,17,23,37-45 * page 285, paragraph 2 * * page 290; table . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/03639049009114886 | International search | [X]US5084278 (MEHTA ATUL M [US]); | [XP]US5622723 (BETTMAN MARIE J [US], et al) |