EP0931426 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING A MODEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson, Inc. P.O. Box 13969 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-3969 / US | [1999/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOON, Billy 305 Parkbranch Lane Apex, NC / US | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Vigars, Christopher Ian Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Vigars, Christopher Ian Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97945456.8 | 03.10.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997US17804 | Priority number, date | US19960729437 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: US 729437 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9817075 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0931426 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0931426 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22, H04Q7/32 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04L65/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES MODEMS | [1999/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING A MODEM | [1999/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CONFIGURER UN MODEM | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.02.2003 | FI | 26.02.2003 | FR | 26.02.2003 | IT | 26.02.2003 | SE | 26.05.2003 | DE | 27.05.2003 | ES | 28.08.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 26.02.2003 | |
FI | 26.02.2003 | ||
FR | 26.02.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
DE | 27.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | BE | 26.02.2003 | |
FI | 26.02.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
DE | 27.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 26.02.2003 | |
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
DE | 27.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 26.02.2003 | |
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 26.02.2003 | |
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 26.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0725550 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A] - JAYAPALAN J ET AL, "CELLULAR DATA SERVICES ARCHITECTURE AND SIGNALING", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, (19940401), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 44 - 55, XP000449745 [A] 1-19 * page 50, column R - page 51, column L * * page 53, column L, line 60 - page 54, column L, line 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MPC.1994.298465 |