EP0929906 - AN ARC CHAMBER FOR AN ION IMPLANTATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott, Richard C. 68 Old Colonial Drive Gardener, MA 01440 / US | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97945495.6 | 03.10.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997US17938 | Priority number, date | US19960725980 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: US 725980 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814977 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929906 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/16, H01J27/22, H01J37/08, H01J37/317, H01L21/265 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
H01J27/022 (EP,US);
H01L21/26 (KR);
H01J27/04 (EP,US);
H01J27/08 (EP,US);
H01J27/16 (EP,US);
H01J27/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Title | German: | BOGENENTLADUNGSIONENQUELLE FÜR EINE IONENIMPLANTATIONSEINRICHTUNG | [1999/29] | English: | AN ARC CHAMBER FOR AN ION IMPLANTATION SYSTEM | [1999/29] | French: | CHAMBRE A ARC DESTINEE A UN SYSTEME D'IMPLANTATION D'IONS | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/43] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]US3960605 (BECK SIEGFRIED, et al) [A] 1 * column 5, paragraph L - column 6, paragraph 3; claims 1,7,8 * [X] 10,11,18; | [A]US4658143 (TOKIGUCHI KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,18 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 1, paragraph L *; | [A]US5089746 (ROSENBLUM STEPHEN S [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11* column 5, line 27 - line 51 *; | [A]US5162699 (TOKORO NOBUHIRO [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11,18 * column 3, line 47 - line 54 * |