EP0941089 - USE OF ANTI-MICROTUBULE AGENTS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/37] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | ||
[2000/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Angiotech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 6660 N.W. Marine Drive Vancouver British Columbia V6T 1Z4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Angiotech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 6660 N.W. Marine Drive Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNTER, William, L. 525 Penticton Street Vancouver, British Columbia V5K 3L7 / CA | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/37] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97945697.7 | 02.12.1997 | [1999/37] | WO1997CA00910 | Priority number, date | US19960032215P | 02.12.1996 Original published format: US 32215 P | US19970063087P | 24.10.1997 Original published format: US 63087 P | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9824427 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0941089 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941089 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/335, A61K31/22, A61K31/425, A61K31/36, A61K31/70, A61K33/08, A61K33/16 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/335 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6957 (EP,US);
A61K31/047 (EP,US);
A61K31/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/223 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/36 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/443 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/7064 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61K33/16 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K47/6951 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K9/12 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
A61K9/5031 (EP,US);
A61K9/5153 (EP,US);
A61K9/7007 (EP,US);
A61K9/7015 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/37] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ANTI-MIKROTUBULI MITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND PROPHYLAXE DER MULTIPLEN SCLEROSE | [2000/23] | English: | USE OF ANTI-MICROTUBULE AGENTS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [2000/23] | French: | UTILISATION DES AGENTS ANTI-MICROTUBULES POUR TRAITER OU PREVENIR LA SCLEROSE EN PLAQUES | [2000/23] |
Former [1999/37] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODE ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND PROPHYLAXE DER ENTZÜNDLICHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [1999/37] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | ||
Former [1999/37] | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES POUR TRAITER OU PREVENIR LES MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 04.02.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00123534.0 / EP1092433 | EP00123537.3 / EP1090637 | EP00123557.1 / EP1070502 | EP05011601.1 / EP1582210 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6163613 ; | [XY]EP0038567 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [X] 7,8 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 14 * * claims 1-9 * [Y] 25-32; | [X]EP0262681 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 4-6 * page 2, line 15 - line 16 * * page 2, line 26 - line 28 * * claim 6 *; | [XY]EP0288794 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 14 - line 17 * * page 1, line 37 - line 39 * * page 7, line 4 - line 57 * * page 8, line 55 - page 9, line 1 * [Y] 25-32; | [Y]WO9412158 (ALKERMES INC [US]) [Y] 25-31 * claims 1-6 *; | [Y]WO9503795 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [Y] 10-15,25,27-30 * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 2 * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 4 * * page 11, line 7 - line 15 * * examples 1,2 * * page 18, line 10 - line 24 * * page 20, line 4 - line 24 *; | [Y]US5443458 (EURY ROBERT P [US]) [Y] 10-15,25,27-30 * column W *; | [A]WO9535095 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [A] 33* claims 1,6 *; | [XY]EP0717041 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [X] 4 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 5 * [Y] 25-32; | [X]US5565439 (PIAZZA GARY A [US], et al) [X] 4,6 * column 2, line 23 - line 39 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 19, Database accession no. 86-123250, XP002062018 & JPS6163613 A 19860401 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM. INC.) [Y] 25,26,29,32 * abstract * | [Y] - YA MIN WANG ET AL., "Preparation and characterization of poly(lactic-co-glycolic acid) microspheres for targeted delivery of a novel anticancer agent, taxol", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1996), vol. 44, no. 10, pages 1935 - 1940, XP000633466 [Y] 25-30,32 * abstract * |