EP0934554 - PRINTER WITH TWO PRINTING UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCÉ Printing Systems GmbH Siemensallee 2 85586 Poing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Océ Printing Systems GmbH Siemensallee 2 85586 Poing / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖHMER, Georg Lustheimerstrasse 8 D-81247 München / DE | 02 /
DIETL, Joseph Fasanenstrasse 148 D-82008 Unterhaching / DE | 03 /
HAHN, Hans Carl-Orff-Weg 16 D-82008 Unterhaching / DE | 04 /
HELLER, Bernward Isarweg 2 D-85551 Kirchheim / DE | 05 /
MUGRAUER, Hubert Parkstrasse 38 D-85604 Zorneding / DE | 06 /
OLBRICH, Otto Birkenstrasse 39 D-82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 07 /
RIGAUER, Reinhold Drechslerstrasse 60 D-85435 Erding / DE | 08 /
ROTHEIMER, Otto Kurzbauerstrasse 4 D-81479 München / DE | 09 /
SEEBERGER, Rudolf Lindenstrasse 24 D-82166 Lochham / DE | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg, Karl-Heinz, et al Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | Schaumburg, Karl-Heinz, et al Patentanwälte Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97945775.1 | 22.10.1997 | [1999/32] | WO1997DE02451 | Priority number, date | DE1996143654 | 22.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19643654 | [1999/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9818052 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934554 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0934554 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
G03G15/231 (EP,US);
G03G15/00 (EP,US);
G03G15/23 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00021 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/32] | Title | German: | DRUCKER MIT ZWEI DRUCKWERKEN | [1999/32] | English: | PRINTER WITH TWO PRINTING UNITS | [1999/32] | French: | IMPRIMANTE COMPORTANT DEUX GROUPES D'IMPRESSION | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 21.05.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.08.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99113945.2 / EP0977095 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4591884 (MIYAMOTO KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 16, line 25 - line 49; figures 7,17 *; | [XDY]WO9113386 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [XD] 1,25,26 * page 8, line 13 - line 23; figures 1,2 *[Y] 22; | [XY]US5150167 (GONDA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 23 - line 28 * * column 5, line 58 - column 7, line 17; figure 1 * [Y] 22; | [X]US5208640 (HORIE KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 16 - line 49; figure 3 * |