EP0939800 - HELICOBACTER ANTIGEN (gamma-GLUTAMYLTRANSFERASE) AND SEQUENCES ENCODING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVALIER, Catherine 31, rue Rieussec F-78220 Viroflay / FR | 02 /
THIBERGE, Jean-Michel 15, rue de la Ferronnerie F-78370 Plaisir / FR | 03 /
LABIGNE, Agnès 47, avenue Beauséjour F-91440 Bures sur Yvette / FR | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97945852.8 | 17.10.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997EP05727 | Priority number, date | US19960028664P | 17.10.1996 Original published format: US 28664 P | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9817804 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0939800 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
C12N9/1044 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | HELICOBACTER ANTIGEN (gamma-GLUTAMYLTRANSFERASE) UND SEQUENZEN DIE SIE KODIEREN | [1999/36] | English: | HELICOBACTER ANTIGEN (gamma-GLUTAMYLTRANSFERASE) AND SEQUENCES ENCODING THE SAME | [1999/36] | French: | ANTIGENE D'HELICOBACTER (gamma-GLUTAMYLTRANSFERASE) ET SEQUENCES CODANT CE DERNIER | [1999/36] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 01.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/45] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - MEGRAUD F. ET AL, "Characterization of 'Campylobacter pyloridis' by culture. Enzymatic profile, and protein content", J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., 1985, 22/6 (1007-1010), USA, XP002062104 [Y] 1-22,35-39 * abstract * | [Y] - PIETROKOVSKI S, "Searching databases of conserved sequence regions by aligning protein multiple-alignments [published erratum appears in Nucleic Acids Res 1996 Nov 1;24(21):4372]", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, OCT 1 1996, 24 (19) P3836-45, ENGLAND, XP002062262 [Y] 1-22,35-39 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.19.3836 | [PX] - TOMB JF ET AL, "The complete genome sequence of the gastric pathogen Helicobacter pylori [see comments]", NATURE, AUG 7 1997, 388 (6642) P539-47, ENGLAND, XP002062106 [PX] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/41483 |