EP0939685 - BENCH FOR MACHINING ELONGATE OBJECTS SUCH AS STRIPS OF MARBLE AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lupi, Quintilio 7, Kings Road London NW10 2BL / GB | [2001/32] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Lupi, Quintilio 7, Kings Road London NW10 2EL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Cavattoni, Fabio, et al Cavattoni & Raimondi Viale dei Parioli, 160 00197 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Cavattoni, Fabio, et al Cavattoni & Raimondi Viale dei Parioli, 160 00197 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 97946044.1 | 18.11.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997IT00284 | Priority number, date | IT1996RM00798 | 22.11.1996 Original published format: IT RM960798 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822258 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939685 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939685 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B24B41/06, B24B9/06, B24B23/02 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
B24B23/02 (EP,US);
B24B41/068 (EP,US);
B24B9/06 (EP,US);
B28D7/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, PT [1999/36] | Title | German: | WERKBANK ZUM BEARBEITEN VON LÄNGLICHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN SOWIE MARMORSTREIFEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [1999/36] | English: | BENCH FOR MACHINING ELONGATE OBJECTS SUCH AS STRIPS OF MARBLE AND THE LIKE | [1999/36] | French: | BANC D'USINAGE D'OBJETS DE FORME ALLONGEE TELS QUE DES BANDEAUX DE MARBRE ET SIMILAIRE | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 03.07.2002 | [2003/21] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4184292 (DEFAZIO AUGUST [US], et al) [A] 5* column 2, line 2 - line 13; figure - *; | [A]US5318005 (MAYER WOLFGANG [AT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 52 - line 58 * * column 4, line 38 - line 44; figure - *; | [A]DE4419119 (TORGAUER MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 32 - line 49; figure 6 * |