EP0950731 - FIBROUS MATERIALS OF FLUORORESINS AND DEODORANT AND ANTIBACTERIAL FABRICS MADE BY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Katsutoshi, Yodogawa-seisakusho Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
ASANO, Jun, Yodogawa-seisakusho Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 03 /
KUSUMI, Toshio, Yodogawa-seisakusho Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97946162.1 | 09.12.1997 | [1999/42] | WO1997JP04514 | Priority number, date | JP19960333828 | 13.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33382896 | [1999/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826115 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0950731 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950731 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/12, D01F6/48, D01F1/10 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
D01F6/12 (EP,KR,US);
D01F1/10 (EP,US);
D01F6/48 (EP,US);
Y10T428/29 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2915 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/42] | Title | German: | FASERMATERIALIEN AUS FLUORHARZEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE DESODORIERENDE UND ANTIBAKTERIELLE FLÄCHENGEBILDEN | [1999/42] | English: | FIBROUS MATERIALS OF FLUORORESINS AND DEODORANT AND ANTIBACTERIAL FABRICS MADE BY USING THE SAME | [1999/42] | French: | MATIERES FIBREUSES A BASE DE FLUORORESINES ET TEXTILES DESODORISANTS ET ANTIBACTERIENS FABRIQUES A PARTIR DE CES MATIERES | [1999/42] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1999 | Translation filed | 24.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 24.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.10.2002 | IT | 23.10.2002 | GB | 23.01.2003 | DE | 01.07.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 23.10.2002 | |
GB | 23.01.2003 | ||
DE | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 23.01.2003 | |
DE | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | DE | 01.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH09256217 ; | [XP]WO9731589 (COLTEC IND INC [US]) [XP] 1-3,5,8-11,15 * page 10, line 17 - line 27 * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 1 * * example 1 * * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US4440879 (KAWACHI SHOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,22 * column 1, line 41 - line 54 * * column 2, line 12 - line 19 * * reference example 1; table 5 * * claim - * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09256217 A 19970930 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [XP] 1-6,8-11,15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH07500386 ; | [Y]JPH05195427 (ISSHIKI TADAO); | [Y]JPH06248545 (SUZUKI SOGYO KK); | [Y]JPH04176312 (SHOWA KOGYO KK) |