EP0941175 - SLIDING CARGO FLOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Personvagnar AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2003/13] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Volvo Personvagnar AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states AB VOLVO 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILHALL, Stig Skillnadsgatan 46 S-461 53 Trollhättan / SE | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Per Rune Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Andersson, Per Rune Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 97946212.4 | 24.11.1997 | [1999/37] | WO1997SE01970 | Priority number, date | SE19960004372 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: SE 9604372 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823465 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941175 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941175 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R5/04 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B60R5/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60R19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/37] | Title | German: | GLEITENDER LADEBODEN | [1999/37] | English: | SLIDING CARGO FLOOR | [1999/37] | French: | PLANCHER COULISSANT POUR FRET | [1999/37] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.03.2003 | IT | 26.03.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 26.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8202175 (JOHANSSON BO CHRISTER); | [Y]US3132755 (GREENSLATE WESLEY M); | [Y]JP61249850 ; | [Y]JP61122048 ; | [A]JP62128848 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 11, No. 102, (M-576); & JP,A,61 249 850 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) 7 November 1986., & JP61249850 A 19861107 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 10, No. 311, (M-528); & JP,A,61 122 048 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) 10 June 1986., & JP61122048 A 19860610 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 11, No. 348, (M-642); & JP,A,62 128 848 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) 11 June 1987., & JP62128848 A 19870611 |