EP0936879 - ARTICLES, METHODS FOR CLEANING PRODUCE AND EDIBLE ANIMAL PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2001 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2002 [2002/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, John, David 7264 Greenfarms Drive Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | 02 /
BETTSCHART, Andrea Gloria Apartment 614, 650 Bishopsgate Drive Cincinnati, OH 45246 / US | 03 /
BULLOCK, Steven, Stewart 9969 Somerset Drive Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 04 /
ROSELLE, Brian, Joseph 1490 Bruton Parish Way Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 05 /
WOO, Ricky, Ah-Man 6940 Van Gordon Road Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 97946410.4 | 30.10.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997US19789 | Priority number, date | US19960029334P | 30.10.1996 Original published format: US 29334 P | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9818352 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936879 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23P1/00, C11D17/04, C11D3/22, C11D9/22 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
C11D3/042 (EP);
C11D13/00 (KR);
A23L5/57 (EP);
C11D10/04 (EP);
C11D17/04 (KR);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D3/2082 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | GEGENSTÄNDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON PRODUKTEN UND ESSBAREN TIERPROTEINEN | [1999/34] | English: | ARTICLES, METHODS FOR CLEANING PRODUCE AND EDIBLE ANIMAL PROTEIN | [1999/34] | French: | PRODUITS MANUFACTURES, PROCEDES POUR NETTOYER DES PRODUITS PRIMAIRES ET DES PROTEINES ANIMALES COMESTIBLES | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/06] | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/06] | Request for further processing for: | 21.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9114759 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-10* page 7, line 21 - line 25; claims 1,8 *; | [XY]WO9512326 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9 * page 14, line 8 - line 14; example III; claim - * [Y] 1-10 |